EP3620439 - A GAS EMISSION REDUCING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING GREEN HOUSE GASES AND/OR AMMONIA EMISSIONS FROM SLURRY STORED IN ONE OR MORE SLURRY STORAGE TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | 06.10.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioCover Holding A/S Veerst Skovvej 6 6600 Vejen / DK | [2022/25] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states Toft, Morten Veerst Skovvej 6 6600 Vejen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toft, Morten 6600 Vejen / DK | [2022/25] |
Former [2020/11] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | Olesen, Birthe Bjerregaard, et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 19194441.2 | 29.08.2019 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | DK2018PA70555 | 29.08.2018 Original published format: DK PA201870555 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620439 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/00, C02F1/66, A01C23/00, C05F17/40 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C02F11/00 (EP,US);
C05F17/10 (US);
A01C23/00 (US);
A01C23/001 (US);
A01C23/04 (US);
A01C3/00 (EP);
A01C3/026 (EP,US);
A61L2/18 (US);
B01D19/0005 (US);
B01D53/77 (US);
C02F1/20 (US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
C05F17/40 (EP,US);
C05F17/70 (US);
C05F17/993 (US);
C05F3/00 (US);
C05F7/00 (EP);
G06F16/2322 (US);
A01C23/002 (US);
A01C23/007 (US);
C02F2103/20 (EP,US);
C02F2203/008 (EP);
C02F2209/006 (EP);
C02F2209/008 (EP);
C02F2209/06 (EP);
C02F2303/02 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP);
Y02C20/20 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON GASEMISSIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON TREIBHAUSGASEN UND/ODER AMMONIAKEMISSIONEN AUS EINER IN EINEM ODER MEHREREN AUFSCHLÄMMUNGSTANKS AUFBEWAHRTEN AUFSCHLÄMMUNG | [2020/11] | English: | A GAS EMISSION REDUCING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING GREEN HOUSE GASES AND/OR AMMONIA EMISSIONS FROM SLURRY STORED IN ONE OR MORE SLURRY STORAGE TANKS | [2020/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION DES ÉMISSIONS DE GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE GAZ À EFFET DE SERRE ET/OU D'ÉMISSIONS D'AMMONIAC DANS DES BOUES STOCKÉES DANS UN OU PLUSIEURS RÉSERVOIRS DE STOCKAGE DE BOUES | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2023 | 12.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/45] | 02.07.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]EP2272316 (TOFT MORTEN [DK]) [XD] 1,3-5,8-13 * abstract * * paragraphs 1, 69, 78, 102, 107, 114, 116, 118, 122, 123 * [Y] 2,6,14 [I] 7,13-15; | [YD]EP2514294 (TOFT MORTEN [DK]) [YD] 6 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]EP2705741 (SOERENSEN HARRY H [DK]) [A] 2* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DK201400102 (KYNDESTOFT MASKINFABRIK APS [DK]) [Y] 14 * abstract *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "First in-storage SAT installed in Poland", (20180606), Search in google with keywords "acidification storage slurry crane", URL: http://balticslurry.eu/2018/06/06/first-in-storage-sat-installed-in-poland/, (20200122), XP002797114 [Y] 2 * the whole document * * Third paragraph, photograph, link to YouTube * * Retrieval date is supported by the URL and screenshots thereof (see enclosures) * | [A] - FANGUEIRO DAVID ET AL, "Acidification of animal slurry- a re", JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20141029), vol. 149, doi:10.1016/J.JENVMAN.2014.10.001, ISSN 0301-4797, pages 46 - 56, XP029102789 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section 2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jenvman.2014.10.001 | by applicant | US2004040516 | EP2272316 | EP2272315 | EP2514294 | DK177702B | - DAVID FANGUEIRO AMAIBRITT HJORTH BFABRIZIO GIOELLI C, Journal of Environmental Management, Elsevier Ltd, (20140000), page 11 | - S.O. PETERSENLO. HOJBERGM. POULSENC. SCHWABJ. ERIKSEN, "Methanogenic community changes and emissions of methane and other gasses, during storage of acidified and untreated slurry", Journal of Applied Microbiology, ISSN 1364-5072, 2014, page 13 | - PETERSEN, SORCN OANDERSEN, ASTRID JERIKSEN, JORGCN, "Effects of cattle slurry acidification and ammonia and methane evolution during storage", Journal of Environmental Quality, (20120100), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 88 - 94 | - Journal of Applied Microbiology, ISSN 1364-5072 |