EP3627486 - DISPLAY STRUCTURE, DISPLAY PANEL USING THE SAME AND DISPLAY DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIAN, Qingfang Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19194871.0 | 02.09.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | CN201811109264 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811109264 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627486 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3233 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP);
H10K59/12 (CN);
H10K59/65 (US);
G09G3/2003 (US);
G09G3/3225 (CN,US);
G09G3/3266 (US);
H10K59/1213 (US);
H10K59/1216 (US);
H10K59/123 (US);
H10K59/131 (US);
H10K59/353 (US);
G09G2300/0408 (US);
G09G2300/0426 (US);
G09G2300/0443 (EP);
G09G2300/0842 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGESTRUKTUR, ANZEIGETAFEL DAMIT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/13] | English: | DISPLAY STRUCTURE, DISPLAY PANEL USING THE SAME AND DISPLAY DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2020/13] | French: | STRUCTURE D'AFFICHAGE, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE L'UTILISANT ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE L'UTILISANT | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/08] | 19.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1146501 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0133]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 11,12; | [XY]US2004233140 (JO HIROAKI [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0142]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 11-15; | [Y]US2008165267 (COK RONALD S [US]) [Y] 11-15* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0090]; figures 2A-18 * |