EP3626832 - METHOD OF IDENTIFYING A PERSON HAVING A PREDISPOSITION TO OR AFFLICTED WITH A CARDIOMETABOLIC DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/13] | METHOD OF IDENTIFYING AND TREATING A PERSON HAVING A PREDISPOSITION TO OR AFFLICTED WITH A CARDIOMETABOLIC DISEASE | ||
[2023/38] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERT, Benjamin, Levine 47 Greenough Street Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
JAISWAL, Siddhartha c/o The Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | 03 /
KATHIRESAN, Sekar c/o The Broad Institute Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02145 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19195023.7 | 25.11.2015 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | US201462084127P | 25.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462084127 P | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3626832 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3626832 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6886 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
G01N2800/32 (US);
G01N33/68 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER PERSON MIT EINER PRÄDISPOSITION FÜR EINE KARDIOMETABOLISCHE KRANKHEIT ODER EINE DAVON BETROFFENE PERSON | [2023/38] | English: | METHOD OF IDENTIFYING A PERSON HAVING A PREDISPOSITION TO OR AFFLICTED WITH A CARDIOMETABOLIC DISEASE | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE PERSONNE PRÉSENTANT UNE PRÉDISPOSITION À OU SOUFFRANT D'UNE MALADIE CARDIO-MÉTABOLIQUE | [2023/38] |
Former [2020/13] | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG EINER PERSON MIT EINER PRÄDISPOSITION FÜR EINE KARDIOMETABOLISCHE KRANKHEIT ODER EINE DAVON BETROFFENE PERSON | ||
Former [2020/13] | METHOD OF IDENTIFYING AND TREATING A PERSON HAVING A PREDISPOSITION TO OR AFFLICTED WITH A CARDIOMETABOLIC DISEASE | ||
Former [2020/13] | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE PERSONNE PRÉSENTANT UNE PRÉDISPOSITION À OU SOUFFRANT D'UNE MALADIE CARDIO-MÉTABOLIQUE | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15816941.7 / EP3224381 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006026074 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * p. 3, l. 1-13; p. 5, 15-21; p. 5, l. 26-36; p. 6, l. 14-20; p. 119; para. bridging p. 259-260 *; | [A] - AXEL MUENDLEIN ET AL, "Occurrence of the JAK2 V617F mutation in patients with peripheral arterial disease", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20141026), vol. 90, no. 1, doi:10.1002/ajh.23874, ISSN 0361-8609, pages E17 - E21, XP055246813 [A] 1-12 * abstract; p. e17, para. "introduction"; p. e18, right-hand col., 4th para. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ajh.23874 | [XI] - H. YAGHOOTKAR ET AL, "Genetic Evidence for a Normal-Weight "Metabolically Obese" Phenotype Linking Insulin Resistance, Hypertension, Coronary Artery Disease, and Type 2 Diabetes", DIABETES, US, (20140721), vol. 63, no. 12, doi:10.2337/db14-0318, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 4369 - 4377, XP055533095 [X] 1,3-6,9 * abstract; p. 4372, para. bridging left- to right-hand col.; para. bridging p. 4372-4373; p. 4374, left-hand col., las para. * [I] 2,7,8,10-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/db14-0318 | [XP] - SIDDHARTHA JAISWAL ET AL, "Age-Related Clonal Hematopoiesis Associated with Adverse Outcomes", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, US, (20141126), vol. 371, no. 26, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1408617, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 2488 - 2498, XP055246853 [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1408617 | [P] - SIDDHARTHA JAISWAL ET AL, "Age-Related Clonal Hematopoiesis Associated with Adverse Outcomes - Online supplementary appendix", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, US, (20141126), vol. 371, no. 26, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1408617, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 2488 - 2498, XP055246869 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1408617 | [AD] - AMÉLIE BONNEFOND ET AL, "Association between large detectable clonal mosaicism and type 2 diabetes with vascular complications", NATURE GENETICS., NEW YORK, US, (20130714), vol. 45, no. 9, doi:10.1038/ng.2700, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 1040 - 1043, XP055246874 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.2700 | [A] - MINGCHAO XIE ET AL, "Age-related mutations associated with clonal hematopoietic expansion and malignancies", NATURE MEDICINE., US, (20141019), vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nm.3733, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1472 - 1478, XP055246879 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.3733 | [T] - Anonymous, "ASXL1 Gene - GeneCards", (20200401), GeneCards, URL: https://www.genecards.org/cgi-bin/carddisp.pl?gene=ASXL1&keywords=asxl1, (20200401), XP055682097 [T] * p. 1 * | [A] - HANSSON G K ED - LONGO DAN L, "Inflammation, Atherosclerosis, and Coronary Artery Disease", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, - NEJM -, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, US, (20050421), vol. 352, no. 16, doi:10.1056/NEJMRA043430, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1685 - 1695, XP003014526 [A] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMra043430 | [I] - PARK UI-HYUN ET AL, "Reciprocal regulation of LXR[alpha] activity by ASXL1 and ASXL2 in lipogen", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20131207), vol. 443, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2013.11.124, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 489 - 494, XP028808341 [I] 1-12 * abstract; para. bridging p. 489-490; p. 492, right-hand col., 1st para. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2013.11.124 | by applicant | US5446603 | US5545531 | US5569827 | US5574206 | US5620881 | US5631407 | US5688692 | US5720936 | US5723719 | US5807522 | US5811633 | US5814716 | US5824840 | US5824838 | US5837832 | US5837875 | US5847257 | US5850004 | US5850001 | US5874219 | US5894078 | US5907078 | US5917124 | US5936138 | US5981829 | US5989431 | US6002067 | US6025539 | US6037521 | US6114122 | US6127598 | US6137029 | US6156727 | US6175057 | US6184435 | US6187992 | US6201166 | US6211428 | US6215040 | US6238910 | US6245963 | WO0145843 | US6255555 | US6300540 | US6313373 | US6316693 | US6323391 | US6323390 | US6365418 | US6369295 | US6372958 | US6372957 | US6410229 | US6420114 | US6432696 | US6452065 | US6475808 | US6489159 | US6515197 | US6531645 | US6548256 | US6576812 | US6593512 | US6610905 | US6613958 | US6649811 | US6657104 | US6689937 | US6710226 | US6717031 | US6750375 | US7038105 | US7045678 | US7098376 | US7112715 | US7119249 | US7186882 | US7214850 | US7220892 | US7265259 | US7276644 | US7358416 | US7371920 | US7393994 | US7432414 | US7449615 | US7479579 | US7495147 | US7538258 | US7544855 | US7566812 | US7626076 | US7655700 | US7667090 | US7709695 | US8557746 | WO2014018423 | US8697359 | US2014170753 | WO2014093661 | WO2014093694 | WO2014093595 | WO2014093718 | WO2014093709 | WO2014093622 | WO2014093635 | WO2014093655 | WO2014093712 | WO2014093701 | US2014179770 | US2014179006 | US2014189896 | US2014186958 | US2014186919 | US2014186843 | US8771945 | US8795965 | EP2764103 | US2014227787 | US2014234972 | US2014242700 | US2014242699 | US2014242664 | EP2771468 | US2014248702 | US2014256046 | US2014273234 | US2014273232 | US2014273231 | US2014287938 | EP2784162 | US2014310830 | US8865406 | US8871445 | US8889356 | US8889418 | US8895308 | US8906616 | WO2014204723 | WO2014204724 | WO2014204725 | WO2014204726 | WO2014204727 | WO2014204728 | WO2014204729 | US8932814 | US8945839 | US8993233 | US8999641 | WO2015089351 | WO2015089354 | WO2015089364 | WO2015089427 | WO2015089462 | WO2015089419 | WO2015089465 | WO2015089486 | US2015184139 | - Nowell PC. Science, (19760000), vol. 194, pages 23 - 8 | - RIDKER PM et al., The New England journal of medicine, (20020000), vol. 347, pages 1557 - 65 | - RAWSTRON AC et al., The New England journal of medicine, (20080000), vol. 359, pages 575 - 83 | - BUSQUE L et al., Blood, (19960000), vol. 88, page 59 65 | - CHAMPION KM et al., British journal of haematology, (19970000), vol. 97, page 920 6 | - CHALLEN GA et al., Nature genetics, (20120000), vol. 44, pages 1179 - 31 | - JAN M et al., Science translational medicine, (20120000), vol. 4, page 149ra18 | - CONSORTIUM STD et al., Nature, (20140000), vol. 506, pages 495 - 101 | - ROULLAND S et al., Journal of clinical oncology: official journal of the American Society of Clinical Oncology, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 1347 - 55 | - MARDIS ER et al., The New England journal of medicine, (20090000), vol. 361, pages 1058 - 66 | - PAPAEMMANUIL E et al., The New England journal of medicine, (20110000), vol. 365, pages 1384 - 506 | - WALTER MJ et al., Leukemia, (20110000), vol. 25, pages 1153 - 8 | - J. S. WELCH et al., Cell, (20120000), vol. 150, pages 264 - 278 | - "Cancer Genome Atlas Research N. Genomic and epigenomic landscapes of adult de novo acute myeloid leukemia", The New England journal of medicine, (20130000), vol. 368, pages 2059 - 74 | - E. PAPAEMMANUIL et al., Blood, (20130000), vol. 122, pages 3616 - 3627 | - WALTER MJ et al., Leukemia, (20130000), vol. 27, pages 1275 - 82 | - ZHANG et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20130000), vol. 110, pages 1398 - 403 | - MORIN RD et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 476, pages 298 - 303 | - LENZ G et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 319, pages 1676 - 9 | - LOHR JG et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 3879 - 84 | - M. TONELLI et al., Circulation, (20080000), vol. 117, pages 163 - 168 | - JEONG M et al., Nature genetics, (20140000), vol. 46, pages 17 - 23 | - KOH KP et al., Cell stem cell, (20110000), vol. 8, pages 200 - 13 | - K. MORAN-CRUSIO et al., Cancer cell, (20110000), vol. 20, pages 11 - 24 | - ODEJIDE O et al., Blood, (20140000), vol. 123, pages 1293 - 6 | - ASMAR F et al., Haematologica, (20130000), vol. 98, pages 1912 - 20 | - COURONNE L et al., The New England journal of medicine, (20120000), vol. 366, pages 95 - 6 | - P. C. NOWELL, Science, (19760000), vol. 194, pages 23 - 28 | - R. BEJAR et al., N Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 364, pages 2496 - 2506 | - "N. Cancer Genome Atlas Research, Genomic and epigenomic landscapes of adult de novo acute myeloid leukemia", N Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 368, pages 2059 - 2074 | - T. HAFERLACH et al., Leukemia, (20140000), vol. 28, pages 241 - 247 | - G. GENOVESE et al., N Engl J Med, (20140000), vol. 371, pages 2477 - 2487 | - M. XIE et al., Nat Med, (20140000), vol. 20, pages 1472 - 1478 | - D. P. STEENSMA et al., Blood, (20150000), vol. 126, pages 9 - 16 | - K. J. MOORE et al., Nat Rev Immunol, (20130000), vol. 13, pages 709 - 721 | - M. CUCHEL et al., Circulation, (20060000), vol. 113, pages 2548 - 2555 | - R. ROSS, N Engl J Med, (19990000), vol. 340, pages 115 - 126 | - P. LIBBY, Nature, (20020000), vol. 420, pages 868 - 874 | - P. LIBBY et al., Am J Med, (20040000), vol. 116, no. 6A, pages 9S - 16S | - P. M. RIDKER et al., N Engl J Med, (20020000), vol. 347, pages 1557 - 1565 | - M. MADJID et al., J Am Coll Cardiol, (20040000), vol. 44, pages 1945 - 1956 | - G. D. BARISH et al., Cell Metab, (20120000), vol. 15, pages 554 - 562 | - R. K. TANGIRALA et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 11896 - 11901 | - A. E. MULLICK et al., J Clin Invest, (20050000), vol. 115, pages 3149 - 3156 | - K. S. MICHELSEN et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20040000), vol. 101, pages 10679 - 10684 | - P. DUEWELL et al., Nature, (20100000), vol. 464, pages 1357 - 1361 | - A. CASTRILLO et al., Mol Cell, (20030000), vol. 12, pages 805 - 816 | - A. CHAWLA et al., Mol Cell, (20010000), vol. 7, pages 161 - 171 | - G. PASCUAL et al., Nature, (20050000), vol. 437, pages 759 - 763 | - A. CHAWLA, Circ Res, (20100000), vol. 106, pages 1559 - 1569 | - S. NGUYEN et al., Dev Dyn, (20070000), vol. 236, pages 1663 - 1676 | - A. MULLALLY et al., Cancer cell, (20100000), vol. 17, pages 584 - 596 | - J. HETTINGER et al., Nat Immunol, (20130000), vol. 14, pages 821 - 830 | - A. BASU et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, pages 1151 - 1161 | - CONG, L.RAN, F.A.COX, D.LIN, S.BARRETTO, R.HABIB, N.HSU, P.D.WU, X.JIANG, W.MARRAFFINI, L.A, "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems", Science, (20150215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1231143, pages 819 - 23, XP055400719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - JIANG W.BIKARD D.COX D.ZHANG FMARRAFFINI LA, "RNA-guided editing of bacterial genomes using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nat Biotechnol, (20130300), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt.2508, pages 233 - 9, XP055249123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2508 | - WANG H.YANG H.SHIVALILA CS.DAWLATY MM.CHENG AW.ZHANG F.JAENISCH R., "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, (20130509), vol. 153, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025, pages 910 - 8, XP028538358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025 | - KONERMANN SBRIGHAM MDTREVINO AEHSU PDHEIDENREICH MCONG LPLATT RJSCOTT DACHURCH GMZHANG F, "Optical control of mammalian endogenous transcription and epigenetic states", Nature, (20130822), vol. 500, no. 7463, pages 472 - 6 | - RAN, FA.HSU, PD.WRIGHT, JAGARWALA, V.SCOTT, DA.ZHANG, F., "Genome engineering using the CRISPR-Cas9 system", Nature Protocols, (20131100), vol. 8, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nprot.2013.143, pages 2281 - 308, XP009174668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2013.143 | - NISHIMASU, H.RAN, FA.HSU, PD.KONERMANN, S.SHEHATA, SI.DOHMAE, N.ISHITANI, R.ZHANG, F.NUREKI, O., "Crystal structure of cas9 in complex with guide RNA and target DNA", Cell, (20140227), vol. 156, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2014.02.001, pages 935 - 49, XP028667665 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.02.001 | - PLATT et al., "CRISPR-Cas9 Knockin Mice for Genome Editing and Cancer Modeling", Cell, (20140000), vol. 159, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2014.09.014, pages 440 - 455, XP055523070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.09.014 | - HSU et al., "Development and Applications of CRISPR-Cas9 for Genome Engineering", Cell, (20140605), vol. 157, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2014.05.010, pages 1262 - 1278, XP055529223 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.05.010 | - WANG et al., "Genetic screens in human cells using the CRISPR/Cas9 system", Science, (20140103), vol. 343, no. 6166, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1246981, pages 80 - 84, XP055294787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1246981 | - KONERMANN SBRIGHAM MDTREVINO AEJOUNG JABUDAYYEH 00BARCENA CHSU PDHABIB NGOOTENBERG JSNISHIMASU H, "Genome-scale transcriptional activation by an engineered CRISPR-Cas9 complex", Nature, (20150129), vol. 517, no. 7536, doi:doi:10.1038/nature14136, pages 583 - 8, XP055585957 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14136 | - ZETSCHE BVOLZ SEZHANG F., "A split-Cas9 architecture for inducible genome editing and transcription modulation", Nat Biotechnol., (20150202), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt.3149, pages 139 - 42, XP055227889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3149 | - CHEN SSANJANA NEZHENG KSHALEM OLEE KSHI XSCOTT DASONG JPAN JQWEISSLEDER R, "Genome-wide CRISPR Screen in a Mouse Model of Tumor Growth and Metastasis,", Cell, (20150312), vol. 160, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2015.02.038, pages 1246 - 1260, XP029203797 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.02.038 | - RAN FACONG LYAN WXSCOTT DAGOOTENBERG JSKRIZ AJZETSCHE BSHALEM OWU XMAKAROVA KS, "n vivo genome editing using Staphylococcus aureus Cas9", Nature, (20150401), vol. 520, no. 7546, doi:doi:10.1038/nature14299, pages 186 - 91, XP055484527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14299 | - SHALEM et al., "High-throughput functional genomics using CRISPR-Cas9", Nature Reviews Genetics, (20150500), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1038/nrg3899, pages 299 - 311, XP055207968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg3899 | - XU et al., "Sequence determinants of improved CRISPR sgRNA design", Genome Research, (20150800), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1101/gr.191452.115, pages 1147 - 1157, XP055321186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.191452.115 | - PARNAS et al., "A Genome-wide CRISPR Screen in Primary Immune Cells to Dissect Regulatory Networks", Cell, (20150730), vol. 162, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2015.06.059, pages 675 - 686, XP029248090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.06.059 | - RAMANAN et al., "CRISPR/Cas9 cleavage of viral DNA efficiently suppresses hepatitis B virus", Scientific Reports, (20150602), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/srep10833, page 10833, XP055305966 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep10833 | - NISHIMASU et al., "Crystal Structure of Staphylococcus aureus Cas9", Cell, (20150827), vol. 162, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2015.08.007, pages 1113 - 1126, XP055304450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.08.007 | - CANVER et al., "BCL11A enhancer dissection by Cas9-mediated in situ saturating mutagenesis", Nature, (20151112), vol. 527, no. 7577, doi:doi:10.1038/nature15521, pages 192 - 7, XP055274680 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature15521 | - ZETSCHE et al., "Cpfl Is a Single RNA-Guided Endonuclease of a Class 2 CRISPR-Cas System", Cell, (20150925), vol. 163, pages 759 - 71 | - SHMAKOV et al., "Discovery and Functional Characterization of Diverse Class 2 CRISPR-Cas Systems", Molecular Cell, (20151022), vol. 60, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2015.10.008, pages 385 - 397, XP055482679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2015.10.008 | - TSAI et al., "Dimeric CRISPR RNA-guided Fokl nucleases for highly specific genome editing", Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 569 - 77, XP055378307 | - KONERMANN et al., Genome-scale transcription activation by an engineered CRISPR-Cas9 complex | - ZUKERSTIEGLER, Nucleic Acids Res., (19810000), vol. 9, pages 133 - 148 | - A.R. GRUBER et al., Cell, (20080000), vol. 106, no. 1, pages 23 - 24 | - PA CARRGM CHURCH, Nature Biotechnology, (20090000), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 62 | - KARGINOVHANNON, "The CRISPR system: small RNA-guided defence in bacteria and archaea", Mole Cell, (20100115), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2009.12.033, page 7, XP055016972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2009.12.033 | - BAILEY et al., J Mol Med (Berl, (19990100), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 244 - 9 | - SATO et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20080400), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 431 - 442 | - ROZEMA et al., PNAS, (20070807), vol. 104, no. 32 | - INGLESE et al., Nature Chemical Biology, (20070000), vol. 3, pages 438 - 441 | - MYERSMILLER, CABIOS, (19880000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - HIROTA et al., Jinrui Idengaku Zasshi, (19890900), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 217 - 23 | - JOHN et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19910125), vol. 19, no. 2, page 408 | - KARLINALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - KARLINALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - PEARSONLIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - ALTSCHULGISH, "Local alignment statistics", Methods in Enzymology, (19960000), vol. 266, pages 460 - 480 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Journal of Molecular Biology, (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - GISHSTATES, Nature Genetics, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 266 - 272 | - WILBURLIPMAN, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19830000), vol. 80, page 726 | - CIBULSKIS K et al., Nature biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 213 - 9 | - COSTELLO M et al., Nucleic acids research, (20130000), vol. 41, page e67 | - ALEXANDROV LB et al., Nature, (20130000), vol. 500, pages 415 - 21 | - ROLLISON DE et al., Blood, (20080000), vol. 112, pages 45 - 52 | - PERLSTEIN TS et al., Archives of internal medicine, (20090000), vol. 169, pages 588 - 94 | - BAZICK HS et al., Critical care medicine, (20110000), vol. 39, pages 1913 - 21 | - BONNEFOND A et al., Nature genetics, (20130000), vol. 45, pages 1380 - 5 | - OLEFSKY JMGLASS CK, Annual review of physiology, (20100000), vol. 72, pages 219 - 46 | - SEMPOS CT et al., The American journal of the medical sciences, (19990000), vol. 317, pages 142 - 6 | - LI HDURBIN R., Bioinformatics, (20090000), vol. 25, pages 1754 - 60 | - DEPRISTO MA et al., Nature genetics, (20110000), vol. 43, pages 491 - 8 | - NG PC et al., PLoS genetics, (20080000), vol. 4, page e1000160 | - FINE JPGRAY, RJ, Journal of the American Statistical Association, (19990000), vol. 94, pages 496 - 509 | WO2013US51418 | EP20130818570 | EP20130824232 | EP20140170383 | WO2013US74743 | WO2013US74790 | WO2013US74611 | WO2013US74825 | WO2013US74812 | WO2013US74667 | WO2013US74691 | WO2013US74736 | WO2013US74819 | WO2013US74800 | WO2014US41790 | WO2014US41800 | WO2014US41803 | WO2014US41804 | WO2014US41806 | WO2014US41808 | WO2014US41809 | WO2014US69897 | WO2014US69902 | WO2014US69925 | WO2014US70068 | WO2014US70127 | WO2014US70057 | WO2014US70135 | WO2014US70175 | WO2015US51691 | WO2015US51830 |