EP3627270 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A TRAJECTORY OF EMERGENCY STOPPING OF AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE, ASSOCIATED VEHICLE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, DK | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSDEV GROUP INNOVATION Immeuble Crystal 3 allée de Grenelle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2020/36] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Transdev Group 3 allée de Grenelle 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE CORNEC, Olivier 19, rue Maurice Berteaux 91120 PALAISEAU / FR | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19197969.9 | 18.09.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | FR20180058488 | 19.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858488 | [2020/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627270 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3627270 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B60W30/00, G01C21/00 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G05D1/0214 (EP);
B60T8/17558 (US);
B60K28/10 (EP);
B60T7/12 (US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B60W30/06 (US);
B60W50/029 (EP);
B60W60/00186 (EP);
G01C21/3407 (EP);
G05D1/0055 (US);
B60K2360/175 (US);
B60K35/28 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER NOTBREMSBAHN EINES AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGS, ENTSPRECHENDES FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN | [2020/13] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A TRAJECTORY OF EMERGENCY STOPPING OF AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE, ASSOCIATED VEHICLE AND METHOD | [2020/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE TRAJECTOIRE D'ARRÊT D'URGENCE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME, VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉS | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 25.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013150244 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-10* page 16, line 13 - line 19 *; | [XI]DE102015003124 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0006] - [0007] - [ 0015] , [ 0023] , [ 0034] - [0056]; figures 2,5; claims 2, 8 * [I] 6; | [A]EP3363698 (VOLVO CAR CORP [SE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0025] *; | [IA] - MAGDICI SILVIA ET AL, "Fail-safe motion planning of autonomous vehicles", 2016 IEEE 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS (ITSC), IEEE, (20161101), doi:10.1109/ITSC.2016.7795594, pages 452 - 458, XP033028383 [I] 1-5,7-10 * page 454; figure 3 * [A] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2016.7795594 |