EP3646992 - HAND MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT, NL | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampel, Thomas Buchenstrasse 3 71106 Magstadt / DE | 02 /
Varga, Zoltan Marek Jozsef u. 29 3521 Miskolc / HU | 03 /
Gergely, Laszlo Hunyadi Janos u. 37 3561 Felsoezsolca / HU | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 19198930.0 | 23.09.2019 | [2020/19] | Priority number, date | DE201810217152 | 08.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018217152 | [2020/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3646992 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3646992 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3646992 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP);
B25F5/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2020/19] | English: | HAND MACHINE TOOL | [2020/19] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL MANUELLE | [2020/19] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4418290 (RYOBI MOTOR PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 2, line 27 - line 40 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 3 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 3,5-8; | [XI]DE102005021731 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * * figure - * [I] 5,6; | [XI]WO2013092028 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * * page 15, line 30 - page 32, line 10 * * figure - * [I] 3,5,6; | [X]DE102014214982 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,10 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0073] ** figure - * | by applicant | DE102012220426 |