EP3661122 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR WEB CONTENT GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pagecloud Inc. 234 Rideau Street Suite 306 Ottawa, Ontario K1N 0A9 / CA | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitzpatrick, Craig 234 Rideau Street, Suite 306 Ottawa, Ontario K1N 0A9 / CA | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Fraser, Karen Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19199755.0 | 14.05.2015 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | US201461992986P | 14.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461992986 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3661122 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3661122 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/16, G06F16/00, G06F16/958 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F16/958 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F40/106 (US);
G06F40/109 (US);
G06F40/134 (US);
G06F40/137 (US);
G06F40/14 (US);
G06F40/186 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON WEBINHALT | [2020/23] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR WEB CONTENT GENERATION | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE GÉNÉRATION DE CONTENUS WEB | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.03.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15792608.0 / EP3143512 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6012071 (KRISHNA B C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 7, line 25 - column 10, line 39 *; | [XI]EP2323347 (EXTENSIS INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 2-7; | [A] - Weston Router, "Efficiently Serving Custom Web Fonts", Portland, OR, USA, (20081230), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090901142318/http://weston.ruter.net/2008/08/27/efficiently-serving-custom-web-fonts/, (20130830), XP055077156 [A] 1-7 * page 1 * |