EP3654073 - MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lintao Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19200539.5 | 30.09.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | CN201811379105 | 19.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811379105 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654073 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/115, G02B1/14, H04M1/02, H04N23/57, // G02B27/01 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G02B1/115 (EP,RU);
H04M1/0266 (EP,KR);
G02B1/11 (CN,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
G02B1/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/026 (EP);
H04N23/57 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2307/40 (US);
B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2383/00 (US);
B32B2457/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | G02B1/115, G02B1/14, H04M1/02, H04N5/225, // G02B27/01 | ||
Former IPC [2020/21] | G02B1/115, G02B1/14, H04M1/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/21] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL | [2020/21] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1136973 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0099] * * figures 2,5a,5b * [A] 1,2,6-13; | [XA]US2017124933 (EVANS V DAVID JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * figure 1A * [A] 2-13; | [YA]US2017176246 (JIA ZHANG [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0037] * * figure 4 *[A] 1-10,12,13; | [XAY]US2017287992 (KWAK WONGEUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,12,13 * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0217] * * paragraph [0228] - paragraph [0229] * * figure 6B * * figure 15 * [A] 6-8 [Y] 3-5,10,11; | [YA]KR20170133773 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0070] * * figure 4 * [A] 1-9,11-13 |