EP3640125 - BUS STRUCUTRE WITH A VERTICAL HANDLE FOR PASSENGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpha EC Industries 2018 S.à r.l. 31, Grand-Rue 1661 Luxembourg / LU | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hallundbæk, Jørgen c/o Alpha EC Industries 2018 S.à r.l. 31, Grand-Rue 1661 Luxembourg / LU | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Rousseau, Cyrille Corax IP s.à.r.l. 2, rue Wilson 2732 Luxembourg / LU | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19202255.6 | 09.10.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | LU20180100962 | 15.10.2018 Original published format: LU 100962 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640125 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D31/02, B60N3/02 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B60N3/02 (EP,CN,US);
B62D31/02 (EP,CN,US);
B60N2/242 (US);
B62D21/03 (US);
B62D47/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUSSTRUKTUR MIT EINEM VERTIKALEN GRIFF FÜR INSASSEN | [2020/17] | English: | BUS STRUCUTRE WITH A VERTICAL HANDLE FOR PASSENGERS | [2020/17] | French: | STRUCTURE DE BUS DOTÉE D'UNE POIGNÉE VERTICALE POUR PASSAGERS | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2426582 (AUSTIN DWIGHT E) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6340202 (STANTON WILLIAM H [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2007056840 (FAROEX LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [YA]DE102007028285 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * figures 1-2 *[A] 1-3,5-15; | [XI]CN104118480 (UNIV JILIN) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * [I] 7,8,14,15; | [XAYI]CN106428240 (UNIV JILIN) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * abstract * [A] 9,11-13 [Y] 4 [I] 7,8,14,15 | by applicant | US6340202 | CN104118480 | CN106428240 |