EP3620908 - CONTROL BUS FOR CONNECTION OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Connectivity Technologies Inc. 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2022/31] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states Lattice Semiconductor Corporation 5555 NE Moore Ct. Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANADE, Shrikant 917 Kara Way Campbell, CA California 95008 / US | 02 /
PEYSAKHOVICH, Alexander 1975 Catrina Court San Jose, CA California 95124 / US | 03 /
LEE, Hyuck Jae 301 Parnassus Avenue, 202 San Francisco, CA California 94117 / US | 04 /
CHOI, Hoon 49 Showers Drive No. C455 Mountain View, CA California 94040 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19205016.9 | 02.12.2008 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US20080969852 | 04.01.2008 Original published format: US 969852 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620908 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G09G5/00, H04L29/06 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
G09G5/006 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
G09G2370/06 (EP);
G09G2370/10 (EP,US);
G09G2370/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2020/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEUERBUS ZUR VERBINDUNG ELEKTRONISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/11] | English: | CONTROL BUS FOR CONNECTION OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2020/11] | French: | BUS DE COMMANDE POUR CONNEXION DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 11.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08869587.9 / EP2238529 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1473701 (GENESIS MICROCHIP INC [US]) [X] 1-4* figures 12,14,18,19 *; | [XI]US2007286246 (KOBAYASHI OSAMU [US]) [X] 1-3,11,12 * paragraphs [0072] , [0116]; figure 30 * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0067] * * figures 18,19 * [I] 4-10,13-15 |