EP3623127 - TOOL HEAD AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A CUTTING PLATE IN THE TOOL HOLDER OF THE TOOL HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oertli Werkzeuge AG Hofstrasse 1 8181 Höri bei Bülach / CH | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERT, Manfred Hohrainstrasse 26 79787 Lauchringen / DE | 02 /
EHRLE, Bruno Unterdorf 6 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | 03 /
OSTOJIC, Zoran Mühlestrasse 25 8105 Regensdorf / CH | 04 /
PAGLIONE, Michael Vordergasse 50 8213 Neunkirch / CH | 05 /
MEILI KAI, Erich Wydenstrasse 49 8408 Winterthur / CH | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 19206429.3 | 14.04.2015 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | CH20140056920 | 14.04.2014 Original published format: CH 569202014 | [2020/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623127 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B27G13/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B27G13/04 (EP,CN,US);
B27G13/10 (EP,CN,US);
B27G13/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUGKOPF UND VERFAHREN ZUM POSITIONIEREN EINER SCHNEIDPLATTE IN DER WERKZEUGAUFNAHME DES WERKZEUGKOPFES | [2020/12] | English: | TOOL HEAD AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A CUTTING PLATE IN THE TOOL HOLDER OF THE TOOL HEAD | [2020/12] | French: | TÊTE D'OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UNE PLAQUE DE COUPE DANS LE LOGEMENT D'OUTIL DE LA TÊTE D'OUTIL | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15717077.0 / EP3131719 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]FR2396630 (VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT]) [X] 1,5-17 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 6 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,4 [I] 2,18; | [XAI]DE2736612 (METABOWERKE KG) [X] 1,5-17 * claims 1, 10 * * page 4, line 1 - line 8 * * page 7, line 16 - line 20 * * page 8, line 4 - line 7 * * figure - * [A] 3,4 [I] 2,18; | [XAI]FR2477460 (LUTZ GMBH CO MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,9-17 * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 17 * * sentence 25 - sentence 33 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,7,8 [I] 2,18; | [XAI]DE3437018 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-17 * abstract * * page 6, line 3 - line 26 * * figure - * [A] 7,8 [I] 4,18; | [XAI]US4658875 (GRABOVAC BOSKO [US]) [X] 1,2,5-17 * abstract * * figures 11,13 * [A] 3,4 [I] 18; | [XAI]EP0275073 (WEINIG MICHAEL GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-17 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - line 44 * * column 3, line 49 - line 57 * * figure - * [A] 9 [I] 4,18; | [XAI]CH679755 (OERTLI WERKZEUGE AG) [X] 1,5-8,10-17 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 5 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 6 * * page -; figure - * [A] 3,4,9 [I] 2,18; | [XAI]GB2324500 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-17 * abstract * * figure 8 * [A] 7-9 [I] 4,18; | [XI]EP1574307 (STARK SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,5-17 * abstract * * figure - *[I] 4,18 | by applicant | DE3636618 | DE8914809U | US2002046632 | US2005265795 |