EP3701981 - DRUG INFUSION SYSTEM WITH REUSABLE AND DISPOSABLE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon, Inc. 1000 Route 202 Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | [2023/38] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Calibra Medical LLC 965 Chesterbrook Boulevard Wayne PA 19087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKENZIE, John 1742 Eaton Ave San Carlos, California 94070-4850 / US | 02 /
CROSS, Brett 2126 6th Ave W Seattle, Washington 98119-2814 / US | 03 /
MARSOT, Travis 419 Lotus Ln Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Brunner, John Michael Owen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19206717.1 | 18.08.2009 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | US20080089749P | 18.08.2008 Original published format: US 89749 P | US20090227157P | 21.07.2009 Original published format: US 227157 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701981 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/158, A61M5/145 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14252 (US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M5/1424 (EP,US);
A61M5/1452 (EP,US);
A61M5/1454 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFINFUSIONSSYSTEM MIT WIEDERVERWENDBAREN UND EINWEG-KOMPONENTEN | [2020/36] | English: | DRUG INFUSION SYSTEM WITH REUSABLE AND DISPOSABLE COMPONENTS | [2020/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PERFUSION DE MÉDICAMENT COMPORTANT DES COMPOSANTS RÉUTILISABLES ET JETABLES | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09808725.7 / EP2326365 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4734092 (MILLERD DONALD L [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]EP0856331 (ALARIS MEDICAL SYST INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 23,24 *; | [A]US2004204673 (FLAHERTY J CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - ** figure - *; | [Y]WO2008024812 (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1,4-12 * * paragraphs [0122] , [0194] - [0196] - [0211] * * claim 1 * | by applicant | US20070906130 | US20080089749 | US20090227157 |