EP3669950 - EXTINGUISHANT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimax GmbH Industriestraße 10-12 23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2022/04] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Minimax GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Föhre, Sven c/o Minimax GmbH & Co. KG Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19208254.3 | 11.11.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | DE201810132828 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018132828 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669950 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A62C35/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSCHMITTELBEHÄLTER | [2020/26] | English: | EXTINGUISHANT CONTAINER | [2020/26] | French: | RÉCIPIENT D'AGENT D'EXTINCTION | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03068320 (DAFO BRAND AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,11-17 * page 9, line 13 - line 24; figure - * [I] 3,5-8,10; | [XD]WO2007077195 (LUXEMBOURG PATENT CO [LU], et al) [XD] 13-15* page 19, line 21 - line 23; figure - * | by applicant | DE7004038U | WO2007077195 | DE202009017884U |