EP3654314 - METHOD AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM FOR SUPPORTING A PERSON IN THE PRACTICE OF SKI SPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOMIC Austria GmbH Atomic Straße 1 5541 Altenmarkt im Pongau / AT | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZER, Helmut Rettensteinweg 27a 5600 St. Johann / AT | 02 /
ROE, Jason Kirchboden 106 5602 Wagrain / AT | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19208293.1 | 11.11.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | AT20180050983 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: AT 509832018 | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654314 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09B5/06, G09B19/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
G09B5/06 (EP);
A63B69/18 (AT);
A63B24/0062 (US);
A43B3/34 (US);
A61B5/1124 (US);
A63B24/0006 (US);
A63B24/0075 (AT,US);
G09B19/0038 (EP,US);
A61B2503/10 (US);
A63B2024/0012 (US);
A63B2024/0068 (US);
A63B2220/51 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM ZUM UNTERSTÜTZEN EINER PERSON BEI DER AUSÜBUNG VON SKISPORT | [2020/21] | English: | METHOD AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM FOR SUPPORTING A PERSON IN THE PRACTICE OF SKI SPORTS | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR AIDER UNE PERSONNE POUR LA PRATIQUE DU SKI | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 18.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016199350 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15* figures 1-3; claims 1,4,5,7,10,12,15 *; | [I]AT517933B (ATOMIC AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0060]; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE9417953U | WO2007015908 | AT517933B |