EP3626794 - METHOD OF MAKING MASKING ARTICLE FOR PRODUCING PRECISE PAINT LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALI, Mahfuza B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Elizabeth E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
CRANDALL, Michael D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19208908.4 | 10.12.2013 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | US201261737225P | 14.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261737225 P | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626794 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/04, C09J133/14, C09J7/38, B05D1/32 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
C09J7/385 (EP,US);
B05D1/325 (EP,US);
C08F218/08 (US);
C08F220/34 (US);
C08F226/10 (US);
C09J133/14 (EP,US);
C08F220/1804 (US);
C09J2203/31 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHABLONENARTIKELS ZUR ERZEUGUNG PRÄZISER MALLINIEN | [2020/13] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING MASKING ARTICLE FOR PRODUCING PRECISE PAINT LINES | [2020/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE DE MASQUAGE POUR PRODUIRE DES LIGNES DE PEINTURE PRÉCISES | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13863515.6 / EP2931827 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7005031 (LUCAST DONALD H [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 57 * * column 10, line 20 - column 11, line 53 * * column 13, lines 39-67 * * column 20, lines 60-67 * * table 3 *; | [A]JPH09157597 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0012] , [0023]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO0200742 (SOLUTIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 1, lines 19-21; claims 1-4 * * page 6, line 26 - page 8, line 10 * * page 15, lines 25-30 * | by applicant | US6828008 | US2010307411 | US4798201 | US5290615 | US4374883 | - "Pressure-Sensitive Adhesives", Treatise on Adhesion and Adhesives Vol. 2, ''Materials, Marcel Dekker, (19690000), vol. 2 |