EP3705753 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION FOR RAM AIR TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, SM | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSON, Michael E. 6812 Deerwood Trail Rockford, IL 61109 / US | 02 /
KONICEK, Timothy Scott 3709 Flambeau Drive Rockford, IL 61114 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 19211151.6 | 25.11.2019 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | US201916292634 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: US201916292634 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705753 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705753 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16H49/00, F16H7/02, B64D41/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B64D41/007 (EP,US);
F16H9/16 (US);
F03D9/25 (US);
F03D9/32 (US);
F16D13/04 (US);
F16D41/00 (US);
F16H7/02 (EP);
F05D2220/34 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE FÜR STAULUFTTURBINEN | [2020/37] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION FOR RAM AIR TURBINES | [2020/37] | French: | TRANSMISSION VARIABLE CONTINUE POUR TURBINES À AIR DYNAMIQUE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 05.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2019 | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | IT | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | IE | 25.11.2021 | LU | 25.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 25.11.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 25.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]GB987032 (DOWTY ROTOL LTD) [I] 1,2,6-8,10,12,14,15 * page 1, lines 51-76; figures 1,2 * * page 1, lines 51-55 * [Y] 3-5,9,13; | [YA]US2010133813 (COTE RICHARD A [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,9,13 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figures 2,3A,3B * [A] 1,6; | [A]EP2696058 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6* figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]US2014263824 (PESYNA KENNETH M [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0008] , [0050]; figures 1,2 * |