EP3663926 - OPEN CHANNEL SOLID STATE DRIVE, NONVOLATILE MEMORY SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME AND METHOD OF POWER LOSS PROTECTION OF OPEN CHANNEL SOLID STATE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, DK, SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dae Ok 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KANG, In Hae 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 03 /
KO, Min Seok 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
ROH, Yang Woo 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
DOH, In Hwan 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Jong Won 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
JANG, Se Jeong 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/24] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19213230.6 | 03.12.2019 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | KR20180155182 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180155182 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663926 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3663926 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F1/30, G06F3/06, G06F11/07, G06F11/20, G06F11/30, G11C16/34 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (EP,CN);
G06F1/305 (US);
G06F1/30 (EP);
G06F3/0617 (US);
G06F3/0631 (CN);
G06F3/064 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0647 (CN);
G06F3/0679 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0688 (US);
G11C14/00 (CN);
G11C16/10 (EP);
G11C16/22 (EP);
G11C16/30 (EP);
G11C16/32 (EP);
G11C5/143 (EP);
G06F11/2015 (EP);
G06F2212/1032 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OFFENKANAL-FESTKÖRPERLAUFWERK, NICHTFLÜCHTIGES SPEICHERSYSTEM DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM STROMVERLUSTSCHUTZ EINES OFFENKANAL-FESTKÖRPERLAUFWERKS | [2020/24] | English: | OPEN CHANNEL SOLID STATE DRIVE, NONVOLATILE MEMORY SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME AND METHOD OF POWER LOSS PROTECTION OF OPEN CHANNEL SOLID STATE DRIVE | [2020/24] | French: | DISQUE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR À CANAL OUVERT, SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE NON VOLATILE LE COMPRENANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES PERTES DE PUISSANCE D'UN DISQUE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR À CANAL OUVERT | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 07.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009150600 (SUDA TAKAYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013] *; | [XAY]US2018088841 (MA JIN-HEE [KR], et al) [X] 13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] * [A] 1-12,15 [Y] 14; | [IY]US2018101302 (LIN WEN-SHENG [TW]) [I] 1,5-12,15 * figures 1, 5, 6B * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0040] * [Y] 14; | [A]US2018129453 (KIM MIN-UK [KR]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 * |