EP3654177 - GENERATION OF API CALL GRAPHS FROM STATIC DISASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cylance Inc. 3001 Bishop Drive, Suite 400 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2022/36] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Cylance Inc. 400 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 900 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | ||
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Cylance Inc. 18201 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOEDER, Derek A. c/o Cylance Inc. 400 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 900 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 02 /
WOLFF, Matthew 680 Newport Center Drive Suite 200 Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
SOEDER, Derek A. c/o Cylance Inc. 18201 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700 Irvine, California 92612 / US | ||
02 /
WOLFF, Matthew 680 Newport Center Drive Suite 200 Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | |||
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
SOEDER, Derek A. c/o Cylance Inc. 18201 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700 Irvine, California 92612 / US | ||
02 /
WOLFF, Matthew c/o Cylance Inc. 18201 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700 Irvine, California 92612 / US | Representative(s) | Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19213981.4 | 30.01.2015 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | US201414169841 | 31.01.2014 Original published format: US201414169841 | US201514590788 | 06.01.2015 Original published format: US201514590788 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654177 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3654177 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/53, G06F8/75, G06F11/34 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
G06F8/75 (EP,US);
G06F11/34 (US);
G06F11/36 (US);
G06F8/53 (EP,US);
G06F11/3414 (EP,US);
G06F2201/865 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON API-ANRUFGRAPHEN VON STATISCHER DEMONTAGE | [2020/21] | English: | GENERATION OF API CALL GRAPHS FROM STATIC DISASSEMBLY | [2020/21] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE GRAPHES D'APPEL D'API À PARTIR D'UN DÉSASSEMBLAGE STATIQUE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15705164.0 / EP3100159 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - PARVEZ FARUKI ET AL, "Mining control flow graph as API call-grams to detect portable executable malware", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SECURITY OF INFORMATION AND NETWORKS, SIN '12, New York, New York, USA, (20120101), doi:10.1145/2388576.2388594, ISBN 978-1-4503-1668-2, pages 130 - 137, XP055681671 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2388576.2388594 |