EP3683017 - ABRASIVE COATING FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE MECHANICAL SYSTEMS AND HIGH TEMPERATURE MECHANICAL SYSTEMS COMPRISING AN ABRASIVE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | [2023/20] |
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shuck, Quinlan 4835 East 71st Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US | [2023/03] |
Former [2020/30] | 01 /
Shuck, Quinlan 4835 East 71st Street Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46220 / US | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 19215750.1 | 12.12.2019 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | US201916250752 | 17.01.2019 Original published format: US201916250752 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3683017 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3683017 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3683017 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, B24D3/06, B24D18/00, B33Y80/00, F01D11/12 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B24D3/06 (EP);
F01D5/288 (US);
B24D18/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
C09K3/1409 (US);
C22C19/05 (US);
F01D11/122 (EP);
F01D5/282 (US);
F01D5/284 (US);
F01D5/286 (US);
F01D11/001 (EP);
F05D2230/11 (EP);
F05D2300/21 (EP);
F05D2300/22 (EP);
F05D2300/226 (EP);
F05D2300/2261 (EP);
F05D2300/228 (EP);
F05D2300/2282 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | B24D3/06, B24D18/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00, F01D11/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHLEIFBESCHICHTUNG FÜR MECHANISCHE HOCHTEMPERATURSYSTEME UND MECHANISCHE HOCHTEMPERATURSYSTEME MIT EINER SCHLEIFBESCHICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | ABRASIVE COATING FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE MECHANICAL SYSTEMS AND HIGH TEMPERATURE MECHANICAL SYSTEMS COMPRISING AN ABRASIVE COATING | [2020/30] | French: | REVÊTEMENT ABRASIF POUR SYSTÈMES MÉCANIQUES À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE ET SYSTÈMES MÉCANIQUES À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE AVEC UN REVÊTEMENT ABRASIF | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4741973 (CONDIT DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,11 * column 1, lines 5-10; claims 1, 7 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 53 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 15 * [Y] 2,12 [I] 4,5,8,10; | [Y]WO2016061585 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0082]; figure 3A *; | [Y]EP3213854 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US]) [Y] 12* paragraphs [0002] , [ 0024]; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2015377039 |