EP3653834 - WELL TOOLS SELECTIVELY RESPONSIVE TO MAGNETIC PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, Texas 77072 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kyle, Donald G. 2610 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 02 /
Merron, Matthew J. 2610 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 03 /
Fripp, Michael L. 2610 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19215993.7 | 08.03.2013 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | US201213440823 | 05.04.2012 Original published format: US201213440823 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653834 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3653834 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/00, E21B34/06, E21B34/14, E21B47/09, E21B47/01, G01D5/12, E21B41/00, E21B47/017, E21B47/092 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
E21B47/017 (EP,US);
E21B23/00 (EP,US);
E21B34/06 (EP,US);
E21B47/092 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | E21B23/00, E21B34/06, E21B34/14, E21B47/09, E21B47/01, G01D5/12, E21B41/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHWERKZEUGE MIT SELEKTIVER REAKTION AUF MAGNETISCHE MUSTER | [2020/21] | English: | WELL TOOLS SELECTIVELY RESPONSIVE TO MAGNETIC PATTERNS | [2020/21] | French: | OUTILS DE PUITS EN RÉPONSE SÉLECTIVE À DES MOTIFS MAGNÉTIQUES | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13771829.2 / EP2834457 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5666050 (BOULDIN BRETT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 9 - line 64 * * pages 1, 2 *; | [A]US2005115708 (JABUSCH KIRBY D [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 2, 6 *; | [A]US2011232917 (SKINNER NEAL G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] ** figures 6, 7 * | by applicant | US20090353664 | US20100688058 |