EP3667114 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING AIRCRAFT BRAKE WEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydro-Aire Aerospace Corp. 3000 Winona Avenue Burbank, CA 91504 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Hydro-Aire Inc. Subsidiary of Crane Co. 3000 Winona Avenue Burbank, CA 91510-7722 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEID, Franklin Michael 29435 Marilyn Drive SANTA CLARITA, 91387 / US | 02 /
DELORIA, David 26528 Township St. SANTA CLARITA, 90045 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael Galbaian S. Coop. Garaia Parke Teknologikoa Goiru Kalea 1 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19216009.1 | 13.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201862780134P | 14.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862780134 P | US201916709584 | 10.12.2019 Original published format: US201916709584 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667114 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667114 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/36, F16D65/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
F16D55/36 (EP);
B64C25/42 (US);
B08B3/08 (US);
B60T8/18 (US);
B60T8/325 (US);
F16D65/0031 (EP,US);
F16D65/0037 (EP,US);
F16D65/0043 (US);
F16D65/847 (US);
Y02T50/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES BREMSENVERSCHLEISSES BEI FLUGZEUGEN | [2020/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING AIRCRAFT BRAKE WEAR | [2020/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉDUIRE L'USURE DES FREINS D'AVION | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | DK | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | NL | 01.02.2023 | PL | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SE | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | NO | 01.05.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.02.2023 | |
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4923056 (NEDELK JOHN [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure;; claim 1 * * column 1, lines 6-11 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 35 - line 66 *; | [A]WO9608396 (DUNLOP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2470098 (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP2391529 (HYDRO AIRE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US9085285 (DEVLIEG GARRETT H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |