EP3649876 - AEROSOL PROVISION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YILMAZ, Ugurhan c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2024/06] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
YILMAZ, Ugurhan c/o British American Tobacco (Investements) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | [2024/06] |
Former [2020/20] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19216390.5 | 24.10.2018 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | GB20170017498 | 24.10.2017 Original published format: GB 201717498 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649876 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3649876 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/30, A24F40/46, A24F40/44, A24F40/85, A61M15/06, A61M11/04, A61M15/00, A61M16/00, A24F40/485 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,IL,US);
A24F40/30 (EP,IL,US);
A24F47/00 (IL,RU);
A24F40/40 (IL,KR);
A24D3/18 (IL,KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,IL,US);
A24F40/42 (IL,KR,US);
A24F40/44 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,IL,US);
A61M11/042 (EP,IL);
A61M15/0003 (EP,IL);
A61M15/0023 (EP,IL);
A61M2016/0024 (EP,IL);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | A24F47/00, A61M11/04, A61M15/00, A61M15/06, A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AEROSOLBEREITSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/20] | English: | AEROSOL PROVISION DEVICE | [2020/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE D'AÉROSOL | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 13.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18803870.7 / EP3614870 | Divisional application(s) | EP24155721.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016062777 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1-16* figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO2017122196 (SYQE MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0033] - [0041]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]CA3010559 (SYQE MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0037]; figure 1B * |