EP3686489 - LAMP WITH COOLING SUPPORT SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, SM | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duerr, Damiano Welzheimer Strasse 19 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 19216779.9 | 17.12.2019 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | DE201910200779 | 23.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200779 | [2020/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686489 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686489 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/503, F21V15/01, F21V17/16, F21V29/70, F21S4/28 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
F21V29/503 (EP);
F21S4/28 (EP);
F21V15/013 (EP);
F21V17/164 (EP);
F21V29/70 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEUCHTE MIT TRAGENDEM KÜHLBLECH | [2020/31] | English: | LAMP WITH COOLING SUPPORT SHEET | [2020/31] | French: | LAMPE AVEC UNE TÔLE DE SUPPORT ÉVACUANT LA CHALEUR | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2019 | AL | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | IE | 17.12.2021 | LU | 17.12.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005073629 (TIR SYSTEMS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,10 * figures 1,4,5,6; claims 1,3,4,19 *; | [X]US2011090682 (ZHENG SHI-SONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,4-9 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP3217067 (INSTA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]DE102017203203 (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * paragraphs [0066] , [0 67]; figures 19,21,23 * | by applicant | US7198387 | US7083308 |