EP3674612 - SURFACE TEMPERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Helmut-Wagner-Straße 1 95111 Rehau / DE | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Otto-Hahn-Strasse 2 95111 Rehau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Dirk Bad Brückenauer Straße 6 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Vohler, Tobias Am Stocken 23a 92318 Neumarkt / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 19217898.6 | 19.12.2019 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | DE201820107263U | 19.12.2018 Original published format: DE 202018107263 U | [2020/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674612 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/14, F24D13/02 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
F24D3/141 (EP);
F24D13/024 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÄCHENTEMPERIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/27] | English: | SURFACE TEMPERING SYSTEM | [2020/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MISE EN TEMPÉRATURE DE SURFACES | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20113353U (HEMSTEDT DIETER [DE]) [A] 11,12* the whole document *; | [XYI]EP1870642 (JOLLY JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012]; figure - * [Y] 3-5,7-9,11,12 [I] 2; | [XAI]DE202007015294U (HOHLWEIN JOERG [DE]) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figure - * [A] 3-5,7-9,11,12 [I] 2; | [YA]EP2530389 (HEMSTEDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0037] - [0038]; figure - * [A] 1-10; | [A]DE202014105163U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [A] 3-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202015101160U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [Y] 3-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0015] - [0030]; figure - *; | [X]KR101842068B (GAON ENERGY INC [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figure - * | by applicant | DE2949511 | DE29812219U | DE10251152 | DE202010009133U | DE202014105163U | EP2995870 |