EP3663399 - MODIFIED FACTOR IX POLYPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Catalyst Biosciences, Inc. 611 Gateway Blvd., Suite 710 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADISON, Edwin L 558 48th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | 02 /
THANOS, Christopher 38 Meadow Hill Drive Tiburon, CA 94920 / US | 03 /
BLOUSE, Grant Ellsworth 1353 Bernal Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 19218636.9 | 03.11.2011 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | US201045629810P | 03.11.2010 Original published format: US 45629810 P | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663399 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3663399 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C12N15/55, A61K38/43 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C12N9/644 (EP,US);
C07K14/745 (KR);
A61K38/36 (KR);
A61K38/4846 (EP,KR,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12N15/01 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 18.06.2020 | ME | 18.06.2020 | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE FAKTOR-IX-POLYPEPTIDE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2020/24] | English: | MODIFIED FACTOR IX POLYPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF | [2020/24] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DU FACTEUR IX MODIFIÉS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 18.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11781973.0 / EP2635677 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2011 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.11.2011 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007149406 (NAUTILUS TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-32 * claim 4 *; | [Y]WO2009137254 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-32 * claim 5 *; | [Y] - J. ROHLENA, "Residues Phe342-Asn346 of Activated Coagulation Factor IX Contribute to the Interaction with Low Density Lipoprotein Receptor-related Protein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20030307), vol. 278, no. 11, doi:10.1074/jbc.M209097200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9394 - 9401, XP055021632 [Y] 1-32 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M209097200 | by applicant | US4522811 | US4892538 | US4952496 | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5283187 | US5323907 | US5621039 | US5672662 | US5969040 | US6017882 | WO0132711 | US6315995 | WO0240544 | US6423826 | US2002166130 | US6531298 | US2003211094 | US6737505 | US2004110675 | US2004133930 | WO2004101740 | US2004235734 | US2004254106 | US2005147618 | US2006104968 | US7125841 | WO2007112005 | US2007254840 | WO2007135182 | WO2007149406 | US2008000422 | US2008050772 | US2008102115 | US2008146494 | US2008167219 | WO2008082613 | US2008188414 | US2008187955 | US2008206808 | US2008214461 | WO2008119815 | US2008280818 | WO2009051717 | US7575897 | WO2009130198 | WO2009137254 | WO2009140015 | WO2010029178 | US7700734 | - HOFFMAN et al., Thromb Haemost, (20010000), vol. 85, pages 958 - 965 | - SCHUETTRUMPF et al., Blood, (20050000), vol. 105, no. 2, pages 2316 - 525 | - MELTON et al., Blood Coagul. Fibrinolysis, (20010000), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 237 - 43 | - CHEUNG et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19920000), vol. 267, pages 20529 - 20531 | - CHEUNG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19960000), vol. 93, pages 11068 - 11073 | - HOPFNER et al., EMBO J., (19970000), vol. 16, pages 6626 - 6635 | - YANG, L. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, no. 11, pages 25032 - 8369 | - BEGBIE et al., Thromb. Haemost., (20050000), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 1138 - 47 | - CHANG, J. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, no. 20, pages 13933 - 13943 | - YANG, L. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, no. 52, pages 50756 - 60 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19680000), vol. 243, pages 3557 - 3559 | - MACDONALD, Hepatology, (19870000), vol. 7, pages 425 - 515 | - CARILLO et al., SIAM J Applied Math, (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - SUNNERHAGEN et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19930000), vol. 268, pages 23339 - 23344 | - AGARWALA et al., Biochemistry, (19940000), vol. 33, pages 5167 - 5171 | - TOWNSEND, Glycobiology, (19910000), vol. 1, pages 139 - 147 | - PEARSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - DEVEREUX, J., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387 | - ATSCHUL, S.F. et al., J. Molec. BioI., (19900000), vol. 215, page 403 | - NEEDLEMAN et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. AppZ. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - GRIBSKOV et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19860000), vol. 14, page 6745 | - Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, National Biomedical Research Foundation, (19790000), pages 353 - 358 | - Biochem., (19720000), vol. 11, page 1726 | - RUGGERI, Nat Med, (20020000), vol. 8, pages 1227 - 1234 | - SAVAGE et al., Curr Opin Hematol, (20010000), vol. 8, pages 270 - 276 | - YUAN, Biochemistry, (20050000), vol. 44, pages 3615 - 3625 | - RAO et al., Cell, (19950000), vol. 82, pages 131 - 141 | - BERKNER, J. Nutr., (20000000), vol. 130, pages 1877 - 80 | - DERIAN et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, pages 6615 - 6618 | - KAUFMAN, Thromb. Haemost., (19980000), vol. 79, pages 1068 - 1079 | - NISHIMURA, J Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, pages 20320 - 20325 | - HARRIS et al., Biochemistry, (19930000), vol. 32, pages 6539 - 6547 | - SCHMIDT et al., Trends Cardio. Med., (20030000), vol. 13, pages 39 - 45 | - CHEN, Thromb. Haemost., (20020000), vol. 88, pages 74 - 82 | - WU, Thromb. Haemost., (20000000), vol. 84, pages 626 - 634 | - ZHONG, J. Biol. Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, page 3622 | - KIRCHHOFER et al., Biochem., (20000000), vol. 39, pages 7398 - 7405 | - AUTIN et al., J. Thromb. Haemost., (20050000), vol. 3, pages 2044 - 2056 | - STOILOVA-MCPHIE et al., Blood, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 1215 - 1223 | - BAJAJ et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, pages 16302 - 16309 | - SCHMIDT, Trends Cαrdiovαsc. Med., (20030000), vol. 13, pages 39 - 45 | - MATHUR et al., J. BioI. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272 | - NEELS et al., Blood, (20000000), vol. 96, pages 3459 - 3465 | - ROHLENA, J BioI. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 9394 - 9401 | - FURMANEK et al., Acta Biochim. Pol., (20000000), vol. 47, pages 781 - 789 | - ELLIOT, J. Bioi. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, pages 16854 - 16862 | - IZAGUIRRE, J Bio Chem, (20060000), vol. 281, pages 13424 - 13432 | - YUAN et al., Biochem., (20050000), vol. 44, pages 3615 - 3625 | - MISENHEIMER et al., Biochem., (20070000), vol. 46, pages 7886 - 7895 | - MISENHEIMER et al., Biochem., (20100000), vol. 49, pages 9977 - 10005 | - CHEUNG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Set U.S.A., (19960000), vol. 93, pages 11068 - 11073 | - MELTON et al., Blood Coαgul. Fibrinolysis, (20010000), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 237 - 43 | - SHEEHAN et al., Blood, (20060000), vol. 107, no. 10, pages 3876 - 82 | - BUYUE et al., Blood, (20080000), vol. 112, pages 3234 - 3241 | - SHEFFIELD, W.P., Br. J. Haematol., (20040000), vol. 126, no. 4, pages 565 - 73 | - ZAMBAUX et al., J. Protein Chem., (19980000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 279 - 84 | - HARRIS, Adv. Drug Deliv. Rev., (20020000), vol. 54, pages 487 - 504 | - VERONESE, Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20020000), vol. 12, pages 177 - 180 | - CHAPMAN et al., Nature Biotech., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 780 - 783 | - BERNOISTCHAMBON, Nature, (19810000), vol. 290, pages 304 - 310 | - YAMAMOTO et al., Cell, (19800000), vol. 22, pages 787 - 797 | - WAGNER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19810000), vol. 75, pages 1441 - 1445 | - BRINSTER et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 296, pages 39 - 42 | - JAY et al., Proc. Nat!. Acad. Sci. USA, (19810000), vol. 78, page 5543 | - DEBOER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19830000), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - "Useful Proteins from Recombinant Bacteria", Scientific American, (19800000), vol. 242, pages 79 - 94 | - HERRERA-ESTRELLA et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 310, pages 115 - 120 | - GARDER et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19810000), vol. 9, page 2871 | - GROSSCHEDL et al., Cell, (19840000), vol. 38, pages 647 - 658 | - ORNITZ et al., Cold Spring Harbor Symp. Quant. Biol., (19860000), vol. 50, pages 399 - 409 | - HANAHAN et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 314, pages 283 - 286 | - ALEXANDER et al., Mol Cell Bioi., (19870000), vol. 7, pages 1436 - 1444 | - KOLLIAS et al., Cell, (19860000), vol. 46, pages 485 - 495 | - PINCKERT et al., Genes and Devel., (19870000), vol. 1, pages 161 - 171 | - KRUMLAUF et al., Mol. Cell. BioI., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 1639 - 1648 | - HAMMER et al., Science, (19870000), vol. 235, pages 53 - 58 | - READHEAD et al., Cell, (19870000), vol. 48, pages 703 - 712 | - MASON et al., Science, (19860000), vol. 234, pages 1372 - 1378 | - WAJIH et al., J. Biol. Chem., vol. 280, no. 36, pages 31603 - 31607 | - PLATIS et al., Protein Exp. Purif., (20030000), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 222 - 30 | - KHALILZADEH et al., J. Ind. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 63 - 69 | - SKOKO et al., Biotechnol. Appl. Biochem., (20030000), vol. 38, pages 257 - 65 | - MUNETA et al., J. Vet. Med. Sci., (20030000), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 219 - 23 | - PHAM et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20030000), vol. 84, pages 332 - 42 | - MAYFIELD et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 438 - 442 | - WATZLAWICK et al., Biochemistry, (19920000), vol. 31, pages 12198 - 12203 | - MIKAMI et al., J. Biotechnol., (20060000), vol. 127, pages 65 - 78 | - SCHWARZ et al., Nature Chem. Biol., (20100000), vol. 6, pages 264 - 266 | - KUMAR et al., Biotechnol. Appl. Biochem., (19960000), vol. 24, pages 207 - 214 | - TYAGARAJAN, Glycobiology, (19960000), vol. 6, pages 83 - 93 | - GILLECE-CASTRO et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19900000), vol. 193, pages 689 - 712 | - DUFFIN et al., Anal. Chem., (19920000), vol. 64, pages 1440 - 1448 | - STURZEBECHER et al., FEBS Lett, (19970000), vol. 412, pages 295 - 300 | - FU et al., Carbohydr. Res., (19940000), vol. 261, pages 173 - 186 | - SUTTON, Anal. Biochem., (19940000), vol. 218, pages 34 - 46 | - HUDDLESTON et al., Anal. Chem., (19930000), vol. 65, pages 877 - 884 | - MEDZIHRADSKY, Methods Mol. Biol., (20080000), vol. 446, pages 293 - 316 | - PRZYSIECKI et al., PNAS, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 7856 - 7860 | - HARVEY et al., J Biol Chem, (20040000), vol. 279, pages 6560 - 6566 | - MAUN et al., Prot Sci, vol. 14, pages 1171 - 1180 | - LIEBMAN et al., PNAS, (19850000), vol. 82, pages 3879 - 3883 | - PUSATERI et al., Critical Care, (20050000), vol. 9, pages S15 - S24 | - SUN, Blood, (20030000), vol. 101, pages 2277 - 2284 | - WANG, PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 11563 - 11566 | - LIN et al., Blood, (19970000), vol. 90, pages 3962 - 3966 | - KUNDU et al., Blood, (19980000), vol. 92, pages 168 - 174 | - JIN et al., Blood, (20040000), vol. 104, no. 9, pages 1733 - 1739 | - EVANS et al., PNAS, (19890000), vol. 86, page 10095 | - MAUSER et al., Blood, (19960000), vol. 88, page 3451 | - KETNER et al., PNAS, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 6186 - 6190 | - FRANCHINI et al., Thromb Haemost., (20050000), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 1138 - 1035 | - WHITE, Thromb. Haemost., (19970000), vol. 78, no. l, pages 261 - 265 | - WEINER et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19850000), vol. 74, no. 9, pages 922 - 5 | - MARGARITIS et al., J Clin Invest, (20040000), vol. 113, pages 1025 - 1031 | - LINDENBAUM et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20040000), vol. 32, no. 21, page e172 | - SROUR et al., Thromb. Haemost., (20030000), vol. 90, no. 3, pages 398 - 405 | - HOPFNER, EMBO J, (19970000), vol. 16, pages 6626 - 6635 | - SICHLER et al., J. Biol. Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, pages 4121 - 4126 | - BOCK et al., Archives of Biochemistry and Biophysics, (19890000), vol. 273, pages 375 - 388 | - PAYNE et al., Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 35, pages 7100 - 7106 | - PETERSEN et al., "Zymogen-Activation Kinetics: Modulatory effects of trans-4-(aminomethyl)cyclohexane-l-carboxylic acid and poly-D-lysine on plasminogen activation", Biochem. J., (19850000), vol. 225, pages 149 - 158 | - OLSON et al., Thromb Haemost, (20040000), vol. 92, no. 5, pages 929 - 939 | US20100456298 |