EP3679876 - INSTRUMENT USED IN SURGERY AND FLUSHING OF THE INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz SE & Co. KG Dr.-Karl-Storz-Straße 34 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thouément, Yann 14, Rue Claude Couson 78690 Les Essarts-Le-Roi / FR | 02 /
Kärcher, Daniel KARL STORZ SE & Co. KG Dr.-Karl-Storz-Str. 34 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 03 /
Besse, Régis 42, Rue de la Foret Verte 78610 Le Perray en Yvelines / FR | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 19218812.6 | 20.12.2019 | [2020/29] | Priority number, date | DE201910100601 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019100601 | [2020/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679876 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/29, A61B17/3201 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP);
A61B17/3201 (EP);
A61B90/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN DER CHIRURGIE VERWENDETES INSTRUMENT UND SPÜLEN DES INSTRUMENTS | [2020/29] | English: | INSTRUMENT USED IN SURGERY AND FLUSHING OF THE INSTRUMENT | [2020/29] | French: | INSTRUMENT UTILISÉ EN CHIRURGIE ET RINÇAGE DE L'INSTRUMENT | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4576650 (YABE HISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - line 64 ** column 3, line 42 - column 8, line 4; figures 1-9 *; | [I]US5408991 (IIDA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * column 7, line 36 - column 13, line 64; figures 5-6,15-24 *; | [A]WO0018521 (MINNTECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 - line 8 * * page 10, line 27 - page 24, line 20; figures 3-4,7-8 *; | [A]US2007112377 (SCHNEITER JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0050]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2009287113 (FREEMAN KEN [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0023] - [0027]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2017332891 (YANG SUNGWOOK [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0055]; figure 3 * |