EP3836528 - NIGHT VISION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2021 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19275146.9 | 10.12.2019 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836528 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/33, H04N5/235, H04N5/04 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H04N23/56 (EP);
H04N23/74 (EP);
H04N5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHTSICHTVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2021/24] | English: | NIGHT VISION DEVICE AND METHOD | [2021/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE VISION NOCTURNE | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4209691 (HUNT GEOFFREY H [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,7-10,12,13,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 68 - column 4, line 2 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 6 [I] 2,11; | [YA]GB2166259 (GEC AVIONICS) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 125 * * page 2, line 6 - line 93 * * figures 1-3 *[A] 1-5,7-15; | [XAYI]US6590560 (LUCAS JOHN L [US]) [X] 1,5,7-10,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 58 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4,12,13 [Y] 6 [I] 2,11; | [XA]US6603507 (JIANG SHIAW-SHIANG [TW], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 25 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 41 * * figures 1-3B * [A] 2-9,11-14 |