EP3749529 - METHOD FOR LASER-INDUCED FORWARD TRANSFER USING EFFECT PIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIERZCHOWIEC, Piotr c/o Merck KGaA Frankfurter Str. 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
MORITZ, Kevin Am Brombeerberg 5 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
WILHELM, Volker Zedernstrasse 51 64563 Lorsch / DE | 04 /
HUNGER, Marc Astrid Lindgren Weg 3 68519 Viernheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
WIERZCHOWIEC, Piotr Kleingemuender Strasse 41/1 69118 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
MORITZ, Kevin Am Brombeerberg 5 64291 Darmstadt / DE | |||
03 /
WILHELM, Volker Zedernstrasse 51 64563 Lorsch / DE | |||
04 /
HUNGER, Marc Astrid Lindgren Weg 3 68519 Viernheim / DE | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19702646.1 | 08.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019EP53118 | Priority number, date | EP20180155973 | 09.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18155973 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154980 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749529 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/392, B41M5/41, C23C14/04, H01L21/285, C23C14/28 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B41M5/392 (EP);
C23C14/048 (EP);
C23C14/28 (EP);
B41M2205/08 (EP);
B41M5/41 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | B41M5/392, B41M5/41, C23C14/04, H01L21/285 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LASERINDUZIERTEN VORWÄRTSÜBERTRAGUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON EFFEKTPIGMENTEN | [2020/51] | English: | METHOD FOR LASER-INDUCED FORWARD TRANSFER USING EFFECT PIGMENTS | [2020/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT VERS L'AVANT INDUIT PAR LASER UTILISANT DES PIGMENTS À EFFET | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 07.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0599689 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XAI]JP2001158177 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 12,13 * the whole document * * especially the examples * [A] 1-11 [I] 14; | [XAI]US2001004485 (TAKAHASHI YOHNOSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 12,13 * the whole document * * especially paragraphs 36-130 and the examples * [A] 1-11 [I] 14 | by applicant | EP1268211 | EP1485255 |