blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3737971

EP3737971 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL-TIME DETERMINATION OF CHARACTERISTICS OF RADIO-CHROMIC FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.08.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.10.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.12.2024  [2024/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Istituto Nazionale di Fisica Nucleare
Via E. Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (RM) / IT
[2020/47]
Inventor(s)01 / BUONTEMPO, Salvatore
c/o Istituto Nazionale Di Fisica Nucleare Via
Enrico Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (Roma) / IT
02 / CAMPAJOLA, Luigi
c/o Istituto Nazionale Di Fisica Nucleare Via
Enrico Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (Roma) / IT
03 / CASOLARO, Pierluigi
c/o Istituto Nazionale Di Fisica Nucleare Via
Enrico Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (Roma) / IT
04 / BREGLIO, Giovanni
c/o Istituto Nazionale Di Fisica Nucleare Via
Enrico Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (Roma) / IT
05 / FIENGA, Francesco
c/o Istituto Nazionale Di Fisica Nucleare Via
Enrico Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (Roma) / IT
06 / DI CAPUA, Francesco
c/o Istituto Nazionale Di Fisica Nucleare Via
Enrico Fermi, 40
00044 Frascati (Roma) / IT
07 / CUTOLO, Antonello
Via Zaro 7
80075 Forio (NA) / IT
08 / CUSANO, Andrea
Via Ferrarecce 75
81100 Caserta / IT
09 / CONSALES, Marco
Via Avellino 22/D
82100 Benevento / IT
10 / VAIANO, Patrizio
Via Passanti Scafati 31
80041 Boscoreale (NA) / IT
 [2020/47]
Representative(s)Borsano, Corrado, et al
Metroconsult S.r.l.
Foro Buonaparte, 51
20121 Milano / IT
[2020/47]
Application number, filing date19703184.207.01.2019
[2020/47]
WO2019IB50098
Priority number, dateIT2018000065209.01.2018         Original published format: IT201800000652
[2020/47]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019138309
Date:18.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3737971
Date:18.11.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3737971
Date:28.09.2022
Language:EN
[2022/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2019
ClassificationIPC:G01T1/04
[2020/47]
CPC:
G01T1/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ECHTZEITBESTIMMUNG VON EIGENSCHAFTEN VON RADIOCHROMEN FILMEN[2020/47]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL-TIME DETERMINATION OF CHARACTERISTICS OF RADIO-CHROMIC FILMS[2020/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION EN TEMPS RÉEL DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE FILMS RADIO-CHROMIQUES[2020/47]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2020National basic fee paid 
31.07.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2020Examination requested  [2020/47]
31.07.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.02.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2022Fee for grant paid
19.08.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.06.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
BG28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
IT28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
MC28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SI28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
IE07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
FR31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
[2024/51]
Former [2024/29]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
IT28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
MC28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SI28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
IE07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
FR31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2024/26]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
IT28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SI28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
IE07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
FR31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2024/08]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SI28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
IE07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
FR31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2023/52]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SI28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
FR31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2023/51]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SI28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2023/49]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
BE31.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2023/47]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
GB07.01.2023
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
CH31.01.2023
LI31.01.2023
Former [2023/43]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
LU07.01.2023
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/34]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
DK28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/30]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
NL28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/29]AL28.09.2022
AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/26]AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
PL28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
IS28.01.2023
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/23]AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
EE28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SK28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/22]AT28.09.2022
CZ28.09.2022
ES28.09.2022
FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
RO28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
PT30.01.2023
Former [2023/20]FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
SM28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
Former [2023/10]FI28.09.2022
HR28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
GR29.12.2022
Former [2023/09]FI28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
LV28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
Former [2023/08]FI28.09.2022
LT28.09.2022
RS28.09.2022
SE28.09.2022
NO28.12.2022
Cited inInternational search[YA]  - CROTEAU ANDRÉ ET AL, "Real-time optical fiber dosimeter probe", OPTICAL FIBERS, SENSORS, AND DEVICES FOR BIOMEDICAL DIAGNOSTICS AND TREATMENT XI, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110210), vol. 7894, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.873619, pages 1 - 7, XP060006929 [Y] 1-3,7 * abstract * * pages 1, 4 * [A] 4-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.873619
 [YA]  - CARON SERGE ET AL, "Selecting the appropriate splitter for a reflective optical fiber dosimeter probe", SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (201210), vol. 8412, doi:10.1117/12.2001179, ISBN 978-0-8194-9090-2, pages 84120D - 84120D, XP060026753 [Y] 1-3,7 * abstract * * page 4 * [A] 4-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2001179
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.