EP3732255 - CORROSION PROTECTION FOR METALLIC SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Matter GBR Limited Wilton Innovation Centre Redcar, Yorkshire TS10 4RF / GB | [2024/07] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Applied Graphene Materials UK Limited Wilton Innovation Centre Redcar, Yorkshire TS10 4RF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEAVER, William c/o Applied Graphene Materials UK Limited Wilton Innovation Centre Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | 02 /
SHARP, Matthew David c/o Applied Graphene Materials UK Limited Wilton Innovation Centre Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | 03 /
JOHNSON, Gaven c/o Applied Graphene Materials UK Limited Wilton Innovation Centre Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 19705790.4 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019GB50316 | Priority number, date | GB20180001931 | 06.02.2018 Original published format: GB 201801931 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019155201 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732255 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/48, C23C28/04, C01B32/158, C01B32/182, C01B32/198, C01B32/194, B05D7/14, B05D7/00, C09D5/08, C08K3/04 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
C01B32/182 (EP,US);
C09D5/084 (GB,KR,US);
B05D1/36 (GB,US);
B05D7/14 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B05D7/54 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (GB,US);
C01B32/158 (KR,US);
C01B32/194 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/042 (EP,KR,US);
C09D163/00 (US);
C09D5/08 (EP,GB,US);
C09D5/24 (GB,KR,US);
C09D7/20 (KR,US);
C09D7/40 (KR,US);
C09D7/61 (GB,KR,US);
C09D7/62 (US);
C09D7/66 (GB,US);
C09D7/69 (US);
C09D7/70 (GB,US);
C23C28/04 (EP,KR,US);
B05D2202/20 (EP,GB,US);
B05D2202/25 (EP,GB,US);
B05D2601/20 (GB,US);
C01B2202/22 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2204/04 (US);
C01B2204/22 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2204/32 (US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/24 (EP,US);
C01P2004/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSSCHUTZ FÜR METALLISCHE SUBSTRATE | [2020/45] | English: | CORROSION PROTECTION FOR METALLIC SUBSTRATES | [2020/45] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION DESTINÉE À DES SUBSTRATS MÉTALLIQUES | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 28.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017349763 (WU MARK Y [TW], et al) [Y] 14-16,20,21 * abstract * * examples 1-4 ** claims 1-16 *; | [XYI] - POURHASHEM SEPIDEH ET AL, "Excellent corrosion protection performance of epoxy composite coatings filled with amino-silane functionalized graphene oxide", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (20170322), vol. 317, doi:10.1016/J.SURFCOAT.2017.03.050, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 1 - 9, XP029975583 [X] 1-5,8-11,19 * abstract * * paragraph [02.3] * * figures 5,6,9 * [Y] 14-16,20,21 [I] 12,13,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2017.03.050 | [XY] - YONG TAE PARK ET AL, "Epoxy Toughening with Low Graphene Loading", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, DE, (20150101), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1002/adfm.201402553, ISSN 1616-301X, pages 575 - 585, XP055587496 [X] 1-5,8-11,19 * abstract * * paragraph [experimental section] * * figure 10 * * paragraph [introduction] * [Y] 14-16,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201402553 | [XY] - SWETHA CHANDRASEKARAN ET AL, "Thermally reduced graphene oxide acting as a trap for multiwall carbon nanotubes in bi-filler epoxy composites", COMPOSITES PART A: APPLIED SCIENCE AND MANUFACTURING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130226), vol. 49, doi:10.1016/j.compositesa.2013.02.008, ISSN 1359-835X, pages 51 - 57, XP055586938 [X] 1-5,8-11 * abstract * * paragraph [experimental section]; figure 1 * [Y] 14-16,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compositesa.2013.02.008 |