EP3769560 - QOS SUPPORT IN WIRELESS BACKHAUL NETWORKS USING CELLULAR RADIO-ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPEL, Karl Georg QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Hong QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LI, Junyi QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
ABEDINI, Navid QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
LUO, Jianghong QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19710515.8 | 13.02.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US17865 | Priority number, date | US201862645095P | 19.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645095 P | US201916273610 | 12.02.2019 Original published format: US201916273610 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019182694 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769560 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3769560 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04W28/02, H04W40/22, H04W28/24, H04W28/08 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H04W28/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0268 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/15542 (EP,KR);
H04W28/0252 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0263 (EP,US);
H04W40/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/12 (US);
H04W84/047 (KR);
H04W88/14 (US);
H04W88/18 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | H04W28/24, H04W28/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QOS-UNTERSTÜTZUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN BACKHAUL-NETZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MOBILFUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN | [2021/04] | English: | QOS SUPPORT IN WIRELESS BACKHAUL NETWORKS USING CELLULAR RADIO-ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES | [2021/04] | French: | PRISE EN CHARGE DE QOS DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE RACCORDEMENT SANS FIL À L'AIDE DE TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO CELLULAIRE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 14.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - NOKIA ET AL, "Architecture and Protocols: MAC adaptation layer based IAB", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-180993 MAC ADAPT BASED IAB PROTOCOL ARCHITECTURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180217), XP051401627 [X] 1-5,10,12-16,21,23-26,31-33,38-40 * the whole document * [Y] 6-9,11,17-20,22,27-30,34-37 | [YA] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "IAB - User-plane Aspects", vol. RAN WG2, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20180122 - 20180126, (20180111), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1800413 IAB USER PLANE ASPECTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5FAHs/2018%5F01%5FNR/Docs/, (20180111), XP051385718 [Y] 6,17,27,34 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-16,18-26,28-33,35-40 | [YA] - HUAWEI, "Adaptation layer based L2 relaying and light L2 relaying", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180214), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-180814 ADAPTATION LAYER BASED L2 RELAYING AND LIGHT L2 RELAYING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180214), XP051401227 [Y] 7-9,11,18-20,22,28-30,35-37 * pages 1-4 * [A] 1-6,10,12-17,21,23-27,31-34,38-40 | [A] - HUAWEI, "Overview on Support of IAB", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180214), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-180815 CONSIDERATIONS ON SUPPORT OF IAB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180214), XP051401228 [A] 1-40 * pages 2-4 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on IAB topologies", vol. RAN WG2, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20170122 - 20170126, (20180112), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1801133 DISCUSSION ON IAB TOPOLOGIES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5FAHs/2018%5F01%5FNR/Docs/, (20180112), XP051386604 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * |