EP3791674 - MECHANISM FOR SSB TRANSMISSION IN NR-U [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, Delaware 19809-3727 / US | ||
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states CONVIDA WIRELESS, LLC 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yifan 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 02 /
IYER, Lakshmi, R. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 03 /
TSAI, Allan, Y. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 04 /
LI, Qing 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 05 /
AWADIN, Mohamed 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 06 /
MURRAY, Joseph, M. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Guodong 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19726828.7 | 09.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019US31545 | Priority number, date | US201862669613P | 10.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669613 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217697 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791674 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W16/14, H04W56/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,KR);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04J11/0069 (KR);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04W16/14 (EP,KR);
H04W48/10 (KR);
H04W56/00 (KR);
H04W56/001 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUR SSB-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN NR-U | [2021/11] | English: | MECHANISM FOR SSB TRANSMISSION IN NR-U | [2021/11] | French: | MÉCANISME DE TRANSMISSION SSB DANS NR-U | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 09.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |