EP3803125 - MAGNETICALLY COUPLED PUMP HAVING A DOUBLE-SHELL SPLIT CAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klaus Union GmbH & Co. KG Blumenfeldstrasse 18 44795 Bochum / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCHNER, Thomas Obernbaakstr. 106 44797 Bochum / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Schneiders & Behrendt Bochum Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestraße 23 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Schneiders & Behrendt Bochum Huestraße 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 19733959.1 | 06.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP64813 | Priority number, date | DE201810113636 | 07.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018113636 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019234170 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803125 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3803125 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/02, F04D15/02, F04D29/02, F04D29/08, H02K49/10 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
F04D13/025 (EP,US);
F04D13/024 (US);
F04D13/026 (US);
F04D13/0606 (US);
F04D15/0263 (EP,US);
F04D29/026 (EP,US);
F04D29/086 (EP,US);
H02K49/106 (EP);
H02K7/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETGEKUPPELTE PUMPE MIT DOPPELSCHALIGEM SPALTTOPF | [2021/15] | English: | MAGNETICALLY COUPLED PUMP HAVING A DOUBLE-SHELL SPLIT CAN | [2021/15] | French: | POMPE À UN COUPLAGE MAGNÉTIQUE POURVUE D'UNE CHEMISE D'ENTREFER DOUBLE ENVELOPPE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3542337 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0268013 (REINECKER HEYKO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 20; figures 13,14 *; | [A]WO2014005564 (RUHRPUMPEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0030]; figure 1.2 *; | [A]WO2014053290 (DICKOW PUMPEN KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN104564791 (DANDONG COLOSSUS PIONEER PUMPS CO LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN105422500 (MILTON ROY IND (SHANGHAI) CO LTD) [A] 1* figure 1 * |