EP3810820 - SPHEROIDAL TITANIUM METALLIC POWDERS WITH CUSTOM MICROSTRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 09.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 6K Inc. 25 Commerce Way Unit 1 North Andover, MA 01845 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADIDI, Kamal c/o 6K Inc. 25 Commerce Way North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 02 /
WROBEL, Gregory c/o 6K Inc. 25 Commerce Way North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 03 /
REDJDAL, Makhlouf 335 E. Foster Street Apt 2 Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | 04 /
DUANMU, Ning 24 Durham Street Nashua, New Hampshire 03063 / US | 05 /
KOZLOWSKI, Michael, C. 62 Charles Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | 06 /
TURCHETTI, Scott 16 Roosevelt Place Newburyport, Massachusetts 01950 / US | [2021/21] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
HADIDI, Kamal 38 Madison Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | ||
02 /
WROBEL, Gregory 105 King George Drive Apt. 12 Boxford, Massachusetts 01921 / US | |||
03 /
REDJDAL, Makhlouf 335 E. Foster Street Apt 2 Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | |||
04 /
DUANMU, Ning 24 Durham Street Nashua, New Hampshire 03063 / US | |||
05 /
KOZLOWSKI, Michael, C. 62 Charles Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | |||
06 /
TURCHETTI, Scott 16 Roosevelt Place Newburyport, Massachusetts 01950 / US | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19735153.9 | 19.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US37956 | Priority number, date | US201816012370 | 19.06.2018 Original published format: US201816012370 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019246242 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810820 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/18, B22F1/00, B22F9/08, H05H1/30, H05H1/42, H05H1/46 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H05H1/42 (EP,US);
B22F1/065 (EP,US);
B22F1/142 (EP,US);
B22F9/082 (EP);
C22F1/183 (EP);
H05H1/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | KUGELIGE TITANMETALLPULVER MIT KUNDENSPEZIFISCHEN MIKROSTRUKTUREN | [2021/17] | English: | SPHEROIDAL TITANIUM METALLIC POWDERS WITH CUSTOM MICROSTRUCTURES | [2021/17] | French: | POUDRES MÉTALLIQUES DE TITANE SPHÉROÏDALES À MICROSTRUCTURES PERSONNALISÉES | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 12.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2017173699 (HADIDI KAMAL [US], et al) [X] 1-15,18,20-27,30-32,34-53,56-66,69-75 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0039] * * claims 1-29 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 16,17,19,28,29,43,44,54,55,67,68 [I] 33,76; | [Y]WO2017177315 (AP&C ADVANCED POWDERS & COATINGS INC [CA]) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 2-3 * * claims 1-90 *; | [XY] - GANG CHEN ET AL, "Spherical Ti-6Al-4V Powders Produced by Gas Atomization", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS, (20160801), vol. 704, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/KEM.704.287, pages 287 - 292, XP055625007 [X] 1-10,37-42,45-47 * abstract * * Section "Experimental"; page 287 * * page 289 - page 291 * * figures 3-6 * [Y] 43,44 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/KEM.704.287 | [Y] - Minfa Lin, "Gas Quenching With Air Products' Rapid Gas Quenching Gas Mixture", (20071231), URL: http://www.airproducts.com/~/media/downloads/article/G/en-gas-quenching-with-rapid-gas-article-330-07-085.pdf?productType=Gases&productLevel1=Mixtures&productLevel2=Metals-Processing&productLevel3=Hardening-Gas-Atmospheres, (20190923), XP055625006 [Y] 16,17,28,29,54,55,67,68 * Section "Heat Transfer Coefficient"; page 1 * * Section "Effect of Gas Type and Gas Pressure"; page 2 * * figure 3 * | by applicant | US4076640 | US6919527 | US2008173641 | US2013270261 | US8748785 | US9932673 | US2018297122 |