EP3797234 - SCRAPER RING FOR A THREE-PART OIL SCRAPER RING AND THREE-PART OIL SCRAPER RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Burscheid GmbH Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÄRENREUTER, Dirk Am Köttersbach 3 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
GILLEN, Jürgen Beckers Kämpchen 43 51371 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/13] | Kurig, Thomas Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19742716.4 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019EP69314 | Priority number, date | DE201810119586 | 13.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018119586 | [2021/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035252 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797234 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3797234 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16J9/20 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
F16J9/20 (EP,US);
F16J9/064 (US);
F16J9/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTREIFRING FÜR EINEN DREITEILIGEN ÖLABSTREIFRING UND DREITEILIGER ÖLABSTREIFRING | [2021/13] | English: | SCRAPER RING FOR A THREE-PART OIL SCRAPER RING AND THREE-PART OIL SCRAPER RING | [2021/13] | French: | SEGMENT RACLEUR POUR UN SEGMENT RACLEUR D'HUILE EN TROIS PARTIES ET SEGMENT RACLEUR D'HUILE EN TROIS PARTIES | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 23.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | NL | 30.03.2022 | PL | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IE | 18.07.2022 | LU | 18.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/33] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 30.03.2022 | |
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2712971 (PHILLIPS HAROLD P) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 48, 57; figure 5 * [A] 6; | [X]JPS5962358U (NA) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE3833322 (COFAP [BR]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, lines 2-7; figure 1 * [A] 6; | [X]JPWO2016038916 (TEIKOKU PISTON RING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * figures 4, 5, 6, 9, 11 *; | [X]JP6251850B (TPR CO LTD) [X] 1-6* figures 6-13 * | by applicant | JPH08159282 | US2016076649 | DE112015001071T | US2017184198 | EP3270012 |