blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3833681

EP3833681 - HA-1 SPECIFIC T CELL RECEPTORS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.05.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.02.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medigene Immunotherapies GmbH
Lochhamer Straße 11
82152 Planegg-Martinsried / DE
[2021/24]
Inventor(s)01 / ELLINGER, Christian
Reisingerstr. 3
80337 München / DE
02 / SOMMERMEYER, Daniel
Nördliche Auffahrtsallee 43
80638 München / DE
03 / BRACHER, Aline
Albert-Roßhaupter-Str. 76b
81369 München / DE
 [2021/24]
Representative(s)Maiwald GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2021/24]Wünsche, Annelie
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date19748549.306.08.2019
[2021/24]
WO2019EP71099
Priority number, dateEP2018018753906.08.2018         Original published format: EP 18187539
[2021/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020030631
Date:13.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3833681
Date:16.06.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2023
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/725, C07K16/28
[2021/24]
CPC:
C07K14/7051 (EP,US); C07K16/2833 (EP,US); A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/24]
TitleGerman:HA-1-SPEZIFISCHE T-ZELL-REZEPTOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2021/24]
English:HA-1 SPECIFIC T CELL RECEPTORS AND THEIR USE[2021/24]
French:RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES DE HA-1 ET LEUR UTILISATION[2021/24]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2021National basic fee paid 
05.03.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2021Examination requested  [2021/24]
05.03.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.03.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2023/17]
22.03.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[IDA]WO2018058002  (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US]);
by applicantUS4703004
 US4851341
 WO03020763
 EP2173869
 WO2018058002
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.