EP3737191 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING UPLINK DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/46] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Bai Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Peng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Zhe Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Guohua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 19750517.5 | 17.01.2019 | [2020/46] | WO2019CN72238 | Priority number, date | CN201810146743 | 12.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810146743 | [2020/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154039 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737191 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/02, H04W72/04, H04W72/08, H04W72/12 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04W72/542 (CN);
H04W74/006 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | H04W74/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON UPLINK-DATEN | [2020/46] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING UPLINK DATA | [2020/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR ENVOYER ET RECEVOIR DES DONNÉES DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2020 | Translation filed | 03.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016164140 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US]); | [A]CN107210881 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL)); | [A]CN107466486 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE LTD); |