EP3999946 - IMAGE TRANSFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMARCEVIC, Milos c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
BUSCH, Stephen Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
AN, Thanh Than Campus SophiaTech 450 Route des Chappes 06410 Biot / FR | 04 /
FILIPPONE, Maurizio Campus SophiaTech 450 Route des Chappes 06410 Biot / FR | 05 /
MEEHAN, Joseph c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 19753007.4 | 06.08.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019EP71123 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023378 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999946 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0484, G06T11/60 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP);
H04N23/631 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | BILDUMWANDLUNG | [2022/21] | English: | IMAGE TRANSFORMATION | [2022/21] | French: | TRANSFORMATION D'IMAGE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 18.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2024/23] | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004086293 (NIK MULTIMEDIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-11 * page 1, line 8 - page 5, line 4 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2012020568 (KOGANE TAKAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] - [0046] - [0054] *; | [XI]US2019174057 (MATSUNAGA MAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0034] - [0041] - [0 68] * * pages 1-5 * [I] 6,8; | [A] - ADOBE, "Adobe Photoshop 6.0 User Guide; Photoshop Basics, Chapter 2: Getting Images into Photoshop and ImageReady", INTERNET CITATION, (20000101), pages 1 - 2, 9, URL: http://kfrserver.natur.cuni.cz/obecne/soubory/PhotoShop6/UserGuide.pdf, (20110824), XP002657457 [A] 1-6,8-11 * the whole document * | [A] - "PhotoImpact 10 User Guide", PhotoImpact 10 User Guide, Ulead Systems Inc., (20040801), pages 1 - 366, XP055057026 [A] 1-6,8-11 * abstract * * pages 125-126 * |