blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3754969

EP3754969 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.05.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.11.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2020/52]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Insun
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu
Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
02 / LEE, Yunho
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu
Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
03 / YANG, Kwansik
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu
Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
 [2020/52]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2020/52]
Application number, filing date19754992.629.01.2019
[2020/52]
WO2019KR01219
Priority number, dateKR2018001806113.02.2018         Original published format: KR 20180018061
[2020/52]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019160260
Date:22.08.2019
Language:KO
[2019/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3754969
Date:23.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3754969
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2021
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/272, H04N21/422, G06T7/70, H04N5/44, H04N21/41, H04N21/4223, H04N21/431, H04N21/478, H04N21/81, H04N5/262, H04N23/60, H04N23/63, H04N23/80
[2023/50]
CPC:
H04N5/272 (EP,KR,US); H04N21/4126 (EP); H04N21/422 (US);
H04N21/4222 (KR); H04N21/4223 (EP); H04N21/44008 (EP);
H04N21/8153 (EP); H04N23/635 (EP); H04N23/64 (EP);
H04N23/661 (KR); H04N23/80 (EP,US); H04N5/2628 (EP,US);
H04N5/265 (US); H04N5/4448 (EP); H04N21/4131 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2021/15]H04N5/272, H04N21/422, H04N5/232, G06K9/00, G06T7/70, H04N5/44, H04N21/41, H04N21/4223, H04N21/431, H04N21/478, H04N21/81, H04N5/262
Former IPC [2020/52]H04N5/272, H04N21/422, H04N5/232
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2020/52]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND OPERATION METHOD THEREOF[2020/52]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ[2020/52]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2020Translation filed 
30.06.2020National basic fee paid 
30.06.2020Search fee paid 
30.06.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2020Examination requested  [2020/52]
23.06.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2024Fee for grant paid
19.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011187731  (TSUCHIDA YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0391] *;
 [A]EP2570986  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]US8731301  (BUSHMAN SERGE J L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 4, line 8 - column 14, line 24 *;
 [A]WO2016124146  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,10,13,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [Y]WO2017078356  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2017262247  (YOGANANDAN ARUN RAKESH [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0168] *;
 [XP]EP3316570  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-5,8-15 * the whole document *;
 [P]EP3337161  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [P] * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0156] *;
 [E]EP3720111  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]KR20110051072  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-5; and figures 1-3. *;
 [A]KR20140060365  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-11; and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2014313117  (ADDY KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0030]; claims 1-11; and figure 2. *;
 [Y]KR20170050995  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0051], [0121], [0139]-[0142], [0161]: and figure 13. *;
 [Y]KR20170105445  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0020], [0042], [0051], [0136]: and figures 2, 23a-23c. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.