EP3759744 - LIGHT EMITTING APPARATUS WITH MELANOPIC EMISSION SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biological Innovation and Optimization Systems, LLC 2796 Loker Ave, W. Suite 111 Carlsbad CA 92010 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLER, Robert 2796 Loker Ave, W., Suite 111 Carlsbad, California 92010 / US | 02 /
COULTER, William 2796 Loker Ave, W., Suite 111 Carlsbad, California 92010 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19758035.0 | 22.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US19298 | Priority number, date | US201862635038P | 26.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862635038 P | US201916270936 | 08.02.2019 Original published format: US201916270936 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019165310 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759744 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, H01L33/58, H01L33/32, H01L27/15 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
A61M21/00 (EP,US);
A61N5/0618 (EP);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SPEKTRUM AN MELANOPISCHER EMISSION | [2021/01] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING APPARATUS WITH MELANOPIC EMISSION SPECTRUM | [2021/01] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À SPECTRE D'ÉMISSION MÉLANOPIQUE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 04.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/46] | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010063566 (UCHIUMI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0011] , [0031] - [0033] - [0056] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 5,6 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 10,12; | [XYI]CN103715342B (JIANG HONG) [X] 1,4-9 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1-3; table 1 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 2,3 | International search | [A]US2010063566 (UCHIUMI TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs 67-93, claims 1-15 and figures 5-9. *; | [A]US2017348506 (BERMAN SAMUEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs 98-251, claims 1-20 and figures 6A-10H. *; | [A]WO2016096367 (PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2017086274 (SOLER ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2016262222 (FROHNAPFEL ANJA [AT], et al) [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. * |