EP3779282 - COMBUSTION DEVICE AND GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | 04.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | 04.06.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI CORPORATION 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI Shogo c/o IHI Corporation, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 02 /
ITO Shintaro c/o IHI Corporation, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA Masahiro c/o IHI Corporation, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 04 /
MIZUTANI Taku c/o IHI Corporation, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 05 /
FUJIMORI Toshiro c/o IHI Corporation, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19774197.8 | 15.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP10826 | Priority number, date | JP20180062164 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018062164 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019188409 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779282 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34, F23R3/36 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
F23R3/346 (EP);
F23R3/34 (KR);
F23R3/40 (US);
B01D53/90 (US);
B01D53/9409 (EP);
B01D53/9427 (US);
F02C7/22 (KR);
F23R3/283 (EP);
F23R3/36 (EP,KR);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (US);
B01D2258/01 (US);
B01D2258/018 (EP);
B01D2259/124 (US);
F05D2240/35 (KR);
F23R2900/00002 (EP);
F23R2900/00005 (EP);
Y02C20/10 (EP);
Y02T50/678 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND GASTURBINE | [2021/07] | English: | COMBUSTION DEVICE AND GAS TURBINE | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMBUSTION ET TURBINE À GAZ | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2020 | Translation filed | 17.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 27.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH06341610 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [Y] 1-2, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0026], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5; | [YA]EP3133342 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-2, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0007], [0016], [0044]-[0047], fig. 5-7 & US 2018/0216828 A1 & WO 2017/029101 A1 & CN 107923612 A * [A] 3-5; | [YA]JPH1073254 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 6-7 * , paragraphs [0023]-[0026], fig. 4 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5 | by applicant | JP2018062164 | JP2016191507 |