EP3853614 - TECHNIQUES FOR GENERATING AND PERFORMING ANALYTICAL METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Ireland Limited 70 Sir John Rogerson's Quay 2 Dublin / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states Waters Technologies Ireland Limited 70 Sir John Rogerson's Quay, Dublin, 2 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Phillip 22 Melbourne Road Bramhall Stockport Cheshire SK7 1LR / GB | 02 /
WHERRY, Matthew Stamford Avenue, Altrincham Road Wilmslow Cheshire SK9 4AX / GB | 03 /
GRAHAM, Kendon S. 187 Spring Street Millis, Massachusetts 02054 / US | 04 /
HOOPER, Alexander 85 Steeple Way Stoke-on-Trent Staffordshire ST4 5BX / GB | 05 /
CARVER, Christopher 34 Mere Bank Davenham, Northwich Cheshire CW9 8NL / GB | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19780024.6 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019IB57996 | Priority number, date | US201862733941P | 20.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862733941 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058939 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853614 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G01N30/88 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G01N30/88 (EP,US);
H01J49/0027 (US);
G01N30/72 (US);
G01N30/8665 (US);
G01N35/00871 (EP,US);
G01R31/00 (US);
H01J49/00 (US);
H01J49/0009 (US);
G01N2030/8804 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND DURCHFÜHRUNG ANALYTISCHER METHODEN | [2021/30] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR GENERATING AND PERFORMING ANALYTICAL METHODS | [2021/30] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE GÉNÉRATION ET DE RÉALISATION DE PROCÉDÉS ANALYTIQUES | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017067922 (ANTONI SASCHA MARTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 2,9,12,19 * abstract ** paragraphs [0024] , [ 0027] , [ 0033] *; | [XYI]US2017115261 (MATSUO KIRIKO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10-15,17,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [ 0031] , [ 0043] - [0049] - [0060]; figure 1 * [Y] 2,9,12,19 [I] 6,8,16,18 |