EP3764733 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOU, Chunhua Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Xing Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Li Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19781254.8 | 25.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019CN79526 | Priority number, date | CN201810301051 | 04.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810301051 | [2021/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019192342 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764733 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, // H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W52/02 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04L1/18 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (CN,KR);
H04L5/00 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (CN,KR);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W52/02 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (CN,KR);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | H04W76/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR DISKONTINUIERLICHEN EMPFANG SOWIE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/02] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION POUR RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE, ET DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | Translation filed | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2298009 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0092] - [0096]; figure 5b * [I] 2-6,8-12; | [XI]US2014086110 (LEE SUNYOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [ 105] , [ 111]; claims 1-3 * [I] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11,12; | [XI]EP3226456 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [X] 1,7,13-15 * paragraph [0091]; figure 10A * [I] 2-6,8-12; | [XI] - ERICSSON, "Remaining issues on DRX timers", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171117), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1713471 - REMAINING ISSUES ON DRX TIMERS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F100/Docs/, (20171117), XP051372179 [X] 1,7,13-15 * sections 2-2.4 and 3 (5.7) * [I] 2-6,8-12 | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180402), vol. RAN WG2, no. V15.1.0, pages 1 - 67, XP051450732 [X] 1-15 * section 5.7 * | [XA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; 5GS; UE conformance specification; Part 1: Protocol conformance specification (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.523-1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180326), vol. RAN WG5, no. V0.2.0, pages 1 - 155, XP051450503 [X] 1,7,13-15 * sections 7.1.5.1.2, 7.1.5.2.2 and 7.1.5.3.2 * [A] 2-6,8-12 | International search | [Y]CN104427595 (SHANGHAI MOBILEPEAK SYSTEMS INC) [Y] 7-9, 15 * description, paragraphs 2 and 67-80, and figures 7 and 8 *; | [Y]CN104518855 (SPREADTRUM COMM SHANGHAI CO) [Y] 2 * description, paragraphs 103-123, and figure 3 *; | [X]WO2017122135 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1, 3-6, 10-14, 16-25 * description, pages 1-5, 14-33 and 35-41, and figures 5-17 *; | [Y]WO2017122135 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [Y] 2, 7-9, 15 * description, pages 1-5, 14-33 and 35-41, and figures 5-17 *; | [A]WO2017130737 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN107079311 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN107787034 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-25* entire document * |