EP3725449 - PRESSURIZING DEVICE, AND WELDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENGENSHA TOA CO., LTD. 23-1, Masugata 1-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214-8588 / JP | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISADA, Yaukazu c/o DENGENSHA TOA CO.,LTD. 4-4, Kosuna-cho Konan-shi Shiga 5203285 / JP | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons LLP (Munich), et al Lehel Carré Thierschplatz 6 80538 Munich / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/43] | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19786899.5 | 26.02.2019 | [2020/43] | WO2019JP07399 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020174597 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725449 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3725449 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20, F16H25/18, B23K11/11, B23K11/30, B23K11/31, F16H25/22 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B23K11/11 (EP,KR,US);
B23K11/3009 (EP,KR,US);
B23K11/315 (EP,US);
B23K11/31 (KR);
B23K11/312 (EP);
F16H25/186 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | B23K11/11, B23K11/30, B23K11/31, F16H25/22 | ||
Former IPC [2020/43] | B23K11/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKVORRICHTUNG UND SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/43] | English: | PRESSURIZING DEVICE, AND WELDING DEVICE | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE SOUS PRESSION ET DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2019 | Translation filed | 24.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001200905 (SUNCALL CORP) [A] 1-3* figure 6 *; | [A]EP2075488 (NANJING KANGNI NEW TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2011232407 (VERHAGEN ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1-4; claims 13-21 * | International search | [A]JPH07124752 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0023]-[0028], fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0910952 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0025], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO0010767 (SEIWA MANUFACTURING CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * , description, page 6, line 2 to page 9, line 11, fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [A]US2004140294 (SALESSE CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-3* , paragraphs [0082]-[0093], fig. 4, 5 (Family: none) * | Examination | JPH07124752 | by applicant | JPH07124752 |