EP3783451 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori,Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNETA, Yasuo c/o Intellectual Property Center OMRON CORPORATION 9 chome - 1, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi, Kyoto 619-0283 / JP | 02 /
OYA, Taku c/o Intellectual Property Center OMRON CORPORATION 9 chome - 1, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi, Kyoto 619-0283 / JP | 03 /
SHIMAMURA, Junji c/o Intellectual Property Center OMRON CORPORATION 9 chome - 1, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi, Kyoto 619-0283 / JP | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19788811.8 | 27.03.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019JP13192 | Priority number, date | JP20180081315 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018081315 | [2021/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019202934 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783451 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B17/02, G05B19/418 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/41885 (EP,US);
G05B17/02 (EP);
G05B19/4184 (US);
G05B19/41875 (US);
G05B19/4188 (US);
G05B2219/13174 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | G05B23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2021/08] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2021/08] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ, ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2020 | Translation filed | 10.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014180644 (MATURANA FRANCISCO [US], et al); | [IY]EP3002646 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]); | [Y]CN104889633B | International search | [Y]JP2013089184 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2015225419 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [XYA]WO2016038705 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELEC INC [JP]) | by applicant | JP2016042378 |