EP3762902 - MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRACKING VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/02] | MONITORING SYSTEM FOR TRACKING VEHICLES | ||
[2022/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gharb, Samy Kalchbühlstrasse 161 8038 Zürich / CH | [2022/52] |
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Gharb, Samy Kalchbühlstrasse 161 8038 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/01] |
Former [2021/02] | Haas, Stephan Patentanwalt Haas KG Brown-Boveri-Straße 8/1/14 2351 Wiener Neudorf / AT | Application number, filing date | 19795346.6 | 23.10.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019IB59055 | Priority number, date | EG20181001694 | 25.10.2018 Original published format: EG 2018101694 | AT20190050687 | 30.07.2019 Original published format: AT 506872019 | [2021/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084513 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762902 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3762902 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G07B15/063 (EP,KR);
G08G1/04 (AT,KR);
G06K19/06028 (KR);
G06K7/1408 (KR);
G07B15/00 (AT);
G07C9/00 (AT,KR)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | G07B15/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON FAHRZEUGEN | [2022/33] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRACKING VEHICLES | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE SUIVI DE VÉHICULES | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/02] | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON FAHRZEUGEN | ||
Former [2021/02] | MONITORING SYSTEM FOR TRACKING VEHICLES | ||
Former [2021/02] | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE POUR LE SUIVI DE VÉHICULES | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 11.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Observations by third parties | 26.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2022 | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
IT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 04.01.2023 | |
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | LV | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | LV | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | LV | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | LV | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19836087 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,11,12* paragraphs [0012] , [0 16]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]DE10243492 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0025] , [0032] * [I] 5; | [X]DE202010006825U (FRIEDLE JOCHEN [AT]) [X] 1-5,11,12 * paragraphs [0022] , [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE102010029811 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,9-12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-3 * [A] 13; | [XI]US2012181340 (HSU WEI [TW]) [X] 1,3,4,8-13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-5 * [I] 5-7; | [X]EP2573709 (JENOPTIK ROBOT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,11,12 * claims 10,11 *; | [X]EP3113118 (TOLL COLLECT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,11,12 * paragraph [0017] * | Examination | - Anonymous, "Ab Januar 2015: Was soll der QR-Code auf dem Kennzeichen? | Express", (20151128), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://www.express.de/ratgeber/motor/ab-januar-2015-was-soll-der-qr-code-auf-dem-kennzeichen-30495?cb=1649057132267, (20220404), XP055908272 | by applicant | US2012181340 |