EP3838282 - COMPOSITION FOR ALLEVIATING ASTHMA OR CHRONIC OBSTRUCTIVE PULMONARY DISEASE BY USING EPILOBIUM PYRRICHOLOPHUM EXTRACT AND LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Food Research Institute 245, Nongsaengmyeong-ro Iseo-myeon Wanju-gun, Jeollabuk-do 55365 / KR | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Hee Soon 2003Ho 109Dong 71, Ogong-ro, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 54871 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Young Do 501Ho 202Dong 40, Hoam-ro, Wansan-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 55063 / KR | 03 /
PARK, So Lim 24-3, Manseongnam-ro, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 54867 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Dong Ho 2001Ho 505Dong 15, Teulmot 1-gil, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 54864 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Dong Uk 101Ho 406Dong 39, Seohyeonseo-ro, Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 28380 / KR | 06 /
EOM, Ji Eun 204Ho 10-6, Baehak 4-gil, Wansan-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 54964 / KR | 07 /
LEE, So Young 701Ho 601Dong 69, Chulpan-ro, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 54865 / KR | 08 /
JUNG, Sun Young 201Ho 12, Macheon-ro 51ga-gil Songpa-gu Seoul 05750 / KR | 09 /
CHOI, Dae Woon 507Ho 1Dong 71, Sodo 1-gil Taebaek-si Gangwon-do 26043 / KR | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19807088.0 | 23.05.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019KR06222 | Priority number, date | KR20180058465 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180058465 | KR20180058466 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180058466 | KR20180058467 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180058467 | KR20180058468 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180058468 | [2021/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019225995 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838282 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/185, A61K36/282, A61K36/53, A61K36/38, A61K36/704, A23L33/105, A61P11/00, A61K36/13, A61K36/066, A61K36/76 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A23L33/105 (EP);
A61K36/076 (EP);
A61K36/13 (EP);
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61K36/282 (EP);
A61K36/38 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/076, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/13, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/282, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/25] | A61K36/185, A61K36/282, A61K36/53, A61K36/38, A61K36/704, A23L33/105, A61P11/00, A61K36/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR LINDERUNG VON ASTHMA ODER CHRONISCHER OBSTRUKTIVER LUNGENERKRANKUNG DURCH VERWENDUNG EINES EXTRAKTES AUS EPILOBIUM PYRRICHOLOPHUM UND DERGLEICHEN | [2021/25] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR ALLEVIATING ASTHMA OR CHRONIC OBSTRUCTIVE PULMONARY DISEASE BY USING EPILOBIUM PYRRICHOLOPHUM EXTRACT AND LIKE | [2021/25] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR SOULAGER L'ASTHME OU LA BRONCHOPNEUMOPATHIE OBSTRUCTIVE CHRONIQUE À L'AIDE D'UN EXTRAIT D'EPILOBIUM PYRRICHOLOPHUM ET SIMILAIRE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2021 | Translation filed | 29.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/25] | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 12.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19712729 (MARSCHALL FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]CN1150008C (TIAN HUA [CN]) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]CN1251732C (XU WANFU [CN]) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]CN106138668 (CHEN DINGQIAN) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]KR100474040B (JIN, Jongsik et al.) [A] 1-37 * See the entire document. *; | [XY]KR20120032405 (KOREA INST ORIENTAL MEDICINE [KR]) [X] 1, 3-6, 8-11, 13-16 , 18-22, 24-27, 29-33 , 35-37 * See abstract; paragraphs [0011], [0015]; claims 1, 2. * [Y] 2, 7, 12, 17, 23, 28, 34; | [A]KR20120034770 (HEBEI YILING MEDICINE RES INST CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-37; | [A]KR20150088414 (CATHOLIC UNIV DAEGU INDUSTRY ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR], et al) [A] 1-37* See the entire document. *; | [Y]KR20160067553 (CHOI CHEOL WON [KR]) [Y] 2, 7, 12, 17, 23, 28, 34 * See abstract; claim 1. * | by applicant | - Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20130000), vol. 187, pages 347 - 365 | - Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20090000), vol. 180, pages 396 - 406 | - Eur Respir J, (20070000), vol. 30, pages 993 - 1013 | - Respirology, (19970000), vol. 1, pages 1 - 4 | - Biol Pharm Bull, (20120000), vol. 35, pages 1752 - 1760 | - Nat Rev Microbiol, (20070000), vol. 5, pages 577 - 82 | - Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (19970000), vol. 155, pages 1441 - 1447 | - Am J Physiol Lung Cell Mol Physiol, (20100000), vol. 298 | - Clin. Sci., (20140000), vol. 126, no. 3, page 207 | - Curr. Opin. Immunol., (20020000), vol. 14, pages 129 - 135 | - J Immunol, (20080000), vol. 181, no. 4, pages 2790 - 8 | - Clin Exp Allergy, (20120000), vol. 42, pages 994 - 1005 | - Int J Chron Obstruct Pulmon Dis, (20170000), vol. 12, pages 1247 - 1254 | - Chest, (20101100), vol. 138, no. 5, pages 1140 - 7 | - Am J Physiol Lung Cell Mol Physiol., (20170000), vol. 312, no. 1, pages L122 - L130 | - Am J Respir Cell Mol Biol, (20130000), vol. 48, pages 531 - 539 | - EurRespir J, (19980000), vol. 12, pages 1200 - 1208 | - PLoS One, (20140515), vol. 9, no. 5, page e97784 | - Respir Res, (20150500), vol. 22, no. 16, page 59 | - Respirology, (20160400), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 467 - 75 | - Nat Immunol, (20140000), vol. 15, pages 1017 - 1025 | - Front Immunol, (20130000), vol. 4, page 1 | - Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (19960000), vol. 154, no. 1, pages 76 - 81 | - J Korean Med Assoc, (20140000), vol. 57, pages 763 - 768 |