EP3881417 - SINGLE STAGE, TWO LEVEL PULSE WIDTH MODULATION STRATEGIES FOR ACTIVE HARMONIC FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGIRMAN, Ismail 5 Farm Springs Road Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19809225.6 | 30.10.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US58848 | Priority number, date | US201862760165P | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862760165 P | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101896 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881417 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3881417 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/12 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
H02M1/12 (EP,US);
H02M7/53871 (US);
H02P27/08 (US);
H02P29/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTUFIGE, ZWEIPEGELIGE PULSWEITENMODULATIONSSTRATEGIEN FÜR AKTIVE HARMONISCHE FILTER | [2021/38] | English: | SINGLE STAGE, TWO LEVEL PULSE WIDTH MODULATION STRATEGIES FOR ACTIVE HARMONIC FILTERS | [2021/38] | French: | STRATÉGIES DE MODULATION D'IMPULSIONS EN LARGEUR À DEUX NIVEAUX ET À ÉTAGE UNIQUE DESTINÉES À DES FILTRES D'HARMONIQUES ACTIFS | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 09.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007216344 (WELCHKO BRIAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011124223 (DANFOSS DRIVES AS [DK], et al) |