EP3870788 - WINDOW LIFT SYSTEM AND MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Bamberg Berliner Ring 1 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAUTMANN, Michael Schaitz 14 95512 Neudrossenfeld / DE | 02 /
HÜMMER, Norman Freiberg 15 96250 Ebensfeld / DE | 03 /
JAHN, Michael Am Ellersgraben 22 96148 Baunach / DE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19816568.0 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP83064 | Priority number, date | DE201810220656 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018220656 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020109539 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870788 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3870788 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/48, E05F15/689 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
E05F11/483 (EP,KR);
E05F11/488 (EP,KR,US);
E05F15/689 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2201/224 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2201/684 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FENSTERHEBERSYSTEM UND KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR | [2021/35] | English: | WINDOW LIFT SYSTEM AND MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR | [2021/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LÈVE-VITRE ET PORTIÈRE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 28.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 13.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2050909 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * figures 1-5 *; | [AD]DE102009033466 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] ** figure 7 * | by applicant | EP1778942 | DE202008016221U | DE102009033466 |