EP3807151 - DYNAMIC DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR BAGGAGE CAROUSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jalloul, Tony Moussa Dahran Tower 3201 Prince Sultan Street Al Khobar, Eastern Province / SA | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19818611.6 | 10.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019IB54824 | Priority number, date | US201862684799P | 14.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862684799 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019239292 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807151 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/36 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B64F1/368 (EP,US);
B65G43/08 (US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G09F9/3026 (US);
B65G2201/0264 (US);
G06K19/0723 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/16] | B64F1/36, B65G43/00, B65G43/08, G09F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES ANZEIGESYSTEM FÜR EIN GEPÄCKKARUSSELL | [2021/16] | English: | DYNAMIC DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR BAGGAGE CAROUSEL | [2021/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE DYNAMIQUE POUR CARROUSEL À BAGAGES | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/07] | 27.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07230563 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]JP2007320722 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4,7,10,12,15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figures 8, 9 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 5; | [XY]JP2016051316 (CANON MARKETING JAPAN INC, et al) [X] 10,12-14 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0072]; figures 15, 16 * [Y] 8,9; | [XYI]KR20160041520 (INCHEONINTERNAT AIRPORT CORP [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0087]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * [Y] 8,9 [I] 5; | [XYI]KR101634501B (KOREA AIRPORTS CORP [KR]) [X] 10,12,14 * paragraph [0041]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0101]; figure 9 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 11 | International search | [A]CA2224849 (BAE AUTOMATED SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] *** whole document ***; | [A]US2014370917 (BUCHHEIM JAMES [US], et al) [A] *** Figures 8A and 8B; paragraphs 145-150 ***; | [A]WO2015036738 (BRITISH AIRWAYS PLC [GB]) [A] *** whole document ***; | [XA]KR20160041520 (INCHEONINTERNAT AIRPORT CORP [KR]) [X] 1-9 and 17-20 *** Figures 2, 3, and 5; paragraphs 57, 59-63, and 87 *** [A] 10-16; | [XA]KR101634501B (KOREA AIRPORTS CORP [KR]) [X] 10-16 *** Figures 1, 4, and 6-9; paragraph 78 *** [A] 1-9 and 17-20; | [A]US2017176570 (GAO YEKUN [CN], et al) [A] *** whole document ***; | [A]CA2976999 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] *** whole document *** |