EP3816300 - CONJUNCTIVAL DISEASE DETECTION METHOD USING OCULAR SURFACE TISSUE, AND BIOMARKER FOR AGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 2-9, Kanda Tsukasa-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDA Kohji c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 02 /
HASHIDA Noriyasu c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 03 /
IIDA Tetsuya c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA Shota c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 05 /
MOTOOKA Daisuke c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 06 /
ASAO Kazunobu c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 07 /
ANDO Satoru c/o Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 3-2-27, Otedori, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19825086.2 | 28.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019JP25827 | Priority number, date | JP20180124504 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018124504 | [2021/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020004626 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816300 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6876, C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6886, C12Q1/689 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/06 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | C12Q1/6806, C12N15/31, C12Q1/6869, G01N33/48, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON BINDEHAUTERKRANKUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON AUGENOBERFLÄCHENGEWEBE UND BIOMARKER FÜR ALTERUNG | [2021/18] | English: | CONJUNCTIVAL DISEASE DETECTION METHOD USING OCULAR SURFACE TISSUE, AND BIOMARKER FOR AGING | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE MALADIE CONJONCTIVALE UTILISANT DU TISSU DE SURFACE OCULAIRE ET BIOMARQUEUR DE VIEILLISSEMENT | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | Translation filed | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012118535 (QUORUM INNOVATIONS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017170571 (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X] - YANJIAO ZHOU ET AL, "The conjunctival microbiome in health and trachomatous disease: a case control study", GENOME MEDICINE,, (20141115), vol. 6, no. 11, doi:10.1186/S13073-014-0099-X, ISSN 1756-994X, page 99, XP021206547 [X] 1,6-9 * abstract; p. 2, right-hand col., 1st-2nd full para.; p. 4, left-hand col., 1st full para.; fig. 2A; table 2: group 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13073-014-0099-x | [X] - RUMI AOKI ET AL, "Identification of Causative Pathogens in Eyes with Bacterial Conjunctivitis by Bacterial Cell Count and Microbiota Analysis", OPHTHALMOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130401), doi:10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.10.001, ISSN 0161-6420, pages 668 - 676, XP055673107 [X] 1,6 * abstract; p. 73, left-hand col., 1st-3rd para. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.10.001 | [X] - JOANNA E. GRAHAM ET AL, "Ocular Pathogen or Commensal: A PCR-Based Study of Surface Bacterial Flora in Normal and Dry Eyes", INVESTIGATIVE OPTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, US, (20071201), vol. 48, no. 12, doi:10.1167/iovs.07-0588, ISSN 1552-5783, page 5616, XP055360531 [X] 1,6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.07-0588 | [X] - THIEL H J ET AL, "Über die Standortflora der menschlichen Bindehaut: Untersuchungen von 135 Personen unterschiedlichen Alters", KLIN MONBL AUGENHEILKD, vol. 205, no. 12, doi:10.1055/s-2008-1045542, (19941201), pages 348 - 357, URL: https://www.thieme-connect.de/products/ejournals/abstract/10.1055/s-2008-1045542, XP055886681 [X] 7,9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2008-1045542 | [XI] - FRANCESCA COLLINA ET AL, "Chlamydia psittaci in ocular adnexa MALT lymphoma: a possible role in lymphomagenesis and a different geographical distribution", INFECTIOUS AGENTS AND CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LO, (20120402), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1750-9378-7-8, ISSN 1750-9378, page 8, XP021125536 [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1750-9378-7-8 | [XP] - KAZUNOBU ASAO ET AL, "Conjunctival dysbiosis in mucosa-associated lymphoid tissue lymphoma", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20190610), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-019-44861-5, pages 1 - 10, XP055673150 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-019-44861-5 | [A] - DONG QUNFENG ET AL, "Diversity of Bacteria at Healthy Human Conjunctiva", INVESTIGATIVE OPTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, US, (20110720), vol. 52, no. 8, doi:10.1167/iovs.10-6939, ISSN 1552-5783, page 5408, XP055886390 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.10-6939 | International search | [X]JP2015188379 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 7-9 * , *; | [XYA]JP2016525355 [X] 1, 3, 5-6 * , * [Y] 1, 6 [A] 2, 4; | [X]WO2017014256 (TAK-CIRCULATOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 7, 9 * , *; | [YA] - ZHOU YANJIAO et al., "The conjunctival microbiome in health and trachomatous disease: a case control study", Genome Medicine, (20140000), vol. 6, doi:10.1186/s13073-014-0099-x, XP021206547 [Y] 1, 6 [A] 2-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13073-014-0099-x | [YA] - AOKI RUMI et al., "Identification of Causative Pathogens in Eyes with Bacterial Conjunctivitis by Bacterial Cell Count and Microbiota Analysis", Ophthalmology, (20130000), vol. 120, no. 4, pages 668 - 676, XP055673107 [Y] 1, 6 [A] 2-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.10.001 | [X] - SHIBAGAKI NAKAKO et al., "Aging-related changes in the diversity of women's skin microbiomes associated with oral bacteria", Scientific Reports, (20170000), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/s41598-017-10834-9, XP055554307 [X] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-10834-9 | [PX] - ASAO KAZUNOBU et al., "Conjunctival dysbiosis in mucosa-associated lymphoid tissue lymphoma", Scientific Reports, (20190000), vol. 9, pages 1 - 10, XP055673150 [PX] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-019-44861-5 | [PX] - JUGE R. et al., "Shift in skin microbiota of Western European women across aging", Journal of Applied Microbiology, (20180900), vol. 125, no. 3, doi:10.1111/jam.13929, pages 907 - 916, XP055554331 [PX] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jam.13929 | by applicant | JP2017029133 | - MAHMOOD S et al., J. Clin. Microbiol., (20120000), vol. 50, no. 11, pages 3799 - 3800 | - SABINE LEIBELING et al., Environ. Sci. Technol., (20100000), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 3793 - 3799 | - ABBY L. GEIS et al., Cancer Discov., vol. 5, no. 10, pages 1098 - 1109 | - ROL N et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20120000), vol. 287, no. 47, pages 40074 - 40082 | - SARA OMENETTI et al., Front. Immunol., (20150000), vol. 6 | - TAYLOR FEEHLEY et al., Curr. Opin. Lmmunol., (20140000), vol. 31, pages 79 - 86 | - OUWEHAND AC et al., World J. Gastroenterol., (20090000), vol. 15, no. 26, pages 3261 - 3268 | - STEFKA AT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, vol. 111, no. 36, pages 13145 - 13150 |